EP3464572 - VARIANTS OF ACETYLSEROTONIN O-METHYLTRANSFERASE AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | [2022/14] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 1 Building 101A 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Hao Gyngemose Parkvej 55 2. tv. 2860 Søborg / DK | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2023/30] |
Former [2019/15] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 17724583.4 | 24.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP62513 | Priority number, date | EP20160171032 | 24.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16171032 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202897 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464572 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464572 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12P17/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
C12P17/10 (EP,US);
C12N9/1007 (EP,US);
C12Y201/01004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VARIANTEN VON ACETYLSEROTONIN-O-METHYLTRANSFERASE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2019/15] | English: | VARIANTS OF ACETYLSEROTONIN O-METHYLTRANSFERASE AND USES THEREOF | [2019/15] | French: | VARIANTES D'ACÉTYLSEROTONIN O-METHYLTRANSFÉRASE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2023/04] |
Former [2019/15] | VARIANTS DE L'ACÉTYLSÉROTONINE O-MÉTHYLTRANSFÉRASE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2007052166 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [XD] 1-4 * figure 8 *; | [XD]WO2013127915 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK]) [XD] 1-4,7-12,15 * abstract * * page 22 - page 23 * * page 27 - page 31 * * sequence 81 *; | [AD]WO2015032911 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 21, line 8 - line 20 * * page 23, lines 2-3 *; | [A] - "SubName: Full=Acetylserotonin O-methyltransferase isoform A {ECO:0000313|EMBL:AHW56684.1};", UniProt, (20140611), Database accession no. X5D311, URL: EBI, XP002771338 [A] 1-15 * sequence . * | [A] - "SubName: Full=Uncharacterized protein {ECO:0000313|Ensembl:ENSPANP00000004828};", UniProt, (20141126), Database accession no. A0A096MY35, URL: EBI, XP002760566 [A] 1-6 * sequence . * | [A] - "SubName: Full=Acetylserotonin O-methyltransferase {ECO:0000313|EMBL:KFQ94517.1};", UniProt, (20141126), Database accession no. A0A091UVP6, URL: EBI, XP002760567 [A] 1-6 * sequence . * | [A] - "Nipponia nippon (crested ibis) Acetylserotonin O-methyltransferase", ENA, (20140618), Database accession no. KFQ94517, URL: EBI, XP002760568 [A] 7,8 * sequence . * | [A] - "SubName: Full=Acetylserotonin O-methyltransferase {ECO:0000313|EMBL:KFO79913.1};", UniProt, (20141126), Database accession no. A0A091GD70, URL: EBI, XP002760569 [A] 1-6 * sequence . * | [AD] - HANY GOUBRAN BOTROS ET AL, "Crystal structure and functional mapping of human ASMT, the last enzyme of the melatonin synthesis pathway", JOURNAL OF PINEAL RESEARCH, DK, (20120709), vol. 54, doi:10.1111/j.1600-079X.2012.01020.x, ISSN 0742-3098, pages 46 - 57, XP055293936 [AD] 3,7-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-079X.2012.01020.x | [A] - YEONG BYEON ET AL, "Cloning and functional characterization of the Arabidopsis N -acetylserotonin O -methyltransferase responsible for melatonin synthesis", JOURNAL OF PINEAL RESEARCH, DK, (20160118), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:10.1111/jpi.12289, ISSN 0742-3098, pages 65 - 73, XP055293937 [A] 3,7-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jpi.12289 | [A] - KIYOON KANG ET AL, "Molecular cloning of a plant N-acetylserotonin methyltransferase and its expression characteristics in rice", JOURNAL OF PINEAL RESEARCH, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, vol. 50, no. 3, doi:10.1111/J.1600-079X.2010.00841.X, ISSN 0742-3098, (20110401), pages 304 - 309, (20110106), XP002679136 [A] 3,7-12,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1600-079X.2010.00841.X | by applicant | US351378 | WO0206337 | WO2007052166 | US7807421 | WO2013127915 | WO2013127914 | US2014134689 | WO2015032911 | - SMITH; WATERMAN, ADV. APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482 | - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444 | - THOMPSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (1994), vol. 22, page 467380 | - ALTSCHUL ET AL., MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 10 | - BAIROCH A., "The ENZYME database", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2000), vol. 28, pages 304 - 305 | - KANG ET AL., J. PINEAL RES., (2011), vol. 50, pages 304 - 309 | - MORAN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, no. 20, pages 12259 - 66 | - WINGE ET AL., BIOCHEM J, (2008), vol. 410, pages 195 - 204 | - PARK ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECHNOL. BIOCEM., (2008), vol. 72, no. 9, pages 2456 - 2458 | - GIBSON ET AL., J. EXP. BOT., (1972), vol. 23, no. 3, pages 775 - 786 | - PARK ET AL., APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (2011), vol. 89, no. 5, pages 1387 - 1394 | - THOMAS ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1990), vol. 184, pages 228 - 34 | - VILLA-KAMAROFF ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1978), vol. 75, pages 3727 - 3731 | - DEBOER ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1983), vol. 80, pages 21 - 25 | - ROMANOS ET AL., YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, pages 423 - 488 | - "Useful proteins from recombinant bacteria", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1980), vol. 242, pages 74 - 94 | - GUO; SHERMAN, MOL CELL BIOL, (1995), vol. 15, pages 5983 - 5990 | - SIMONEN; PALVA, MICROBIOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (1993), vol. 57, pages 109 - 137 | - SOMERVILLE, R. L.; HERRMANN, R. M., Amino acids, Biosynthesis and Genetic Regulation, ADDISON-WESLEY PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1983), pages 301 - 322 | - AIDA ET AL., Bio-technology of amino acid production, progress in industrial microbiology, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1986), vol. 24, pages 188 - 206 | - LEE ET AL., KOREAN J. CHEM. ENG., (2010), vol. 27, pages 587 - 589 | - CHANG; COHEN, MOLECULAR GENERAL GENETICS, (1979), vol. 168, pages 111 - 115 | - YOUNG; SPIZIZEN, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1961), vol. 81, pages 823 - 829 | - DUBNAU; DAVIDOFF-ABELSON, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1971), vol. 56, pages 209 - 221 | - SHIGEKAWA; DOWER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, pages 742 - 751 | - KOEHLER; THOME, JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1987), vol. 169, pages 5771 - 5278 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1968), vol. 60, page 160 | - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1981), vol. 9, page 309 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (1978), vol. 120, page 517 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (1969), vol. 41, page 459 | - GENETICS, (1954), vol. 39, page 440 | - MILLER, Journal of Experiments in Molecular Genetics, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1972), pages 431 - 433 | - BOSTIAN, K. L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4505 | - BITTER, G. A. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, page 5330 | - VERDUYN ET AL., YEAST, (1992), vol. 8, pages 501 - 517 | - HARUMI ET AL., J CHROMATOGR B, (1996), vol. 675, pages 152 - 156 | - BOTROS ET AL., J PINEAL RES, (2013), vol. 54, pages 46 - 57 | - BYEON ET AL., J. PINEAL RES, (2016), vol. 60, pages 65 - 73 |