EP3442604 - PHOTOCATALYTIC AIR PURIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states White, Gary Willow Lodge, Main Road Stickney Boston PE22 8EQ / GB | [2019/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2019/08] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James LOVEN Patents & Trademarks Limited 51 Wragby Road Sudbrooke Lincoln, Lincolnshire LN2 2QU / GB | [2019/08] | Application number, filing date | 17724865.5 | 13.04.2017 | [2019/08] | WO2017GB51059 | Priority number, date | GB20160006453 | 13.04.2016 Original published format: GB 201606453 | [2019/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017178842 | Date: | 19.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3442604 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/20 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
A61L9/205 (EP,GB);
A61L9/18 (GB);
B01D53/007 (GB);
B01D53/86 (GB);
A61L2209/14 (EP);
A61L2209/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/08] | Title | German: | PHOTOKATALYTISCHER LUFTREINIGER | [2019/08] | English: | PHOTOCATALYTIC AIR PURIFIER | [2019/08] | French: | PURIFICATEUR D'AIR PHOTOCATALYTIQUE | [2019/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/08] | 06.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 23.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1426065 (ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTR CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0047] - [0049]; figures 1, 4 *; | [X]US6797127 (MURATA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 22; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2006065491 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0023]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0017]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2007027419 (ULTRAVIOLET SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [A] 13* page 12, line 18; claim 6 *; | [X]US2008031783 (BRIGGS DANIEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * "anatase"; paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2011135601 (ZUPIN ELIGIO [IT]) [X] 1-16 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 15; figure 5 * * "fan"; page 9, line 21 *; | [X]US2013171031 (GARFIELD KIRK [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] , [0 66] * |