EP3463119 - FEATURES AND METHODS TO CONTROL DELIVERY OF COOLING FLUID TO END EFFECTOR OF ULTRASONIC SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YATES, David C. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
BOYD, Benjamin M. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
DICKERSON, Benjamin D. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 04 /
BLACK, Brian D 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 05 /
FALLER, Craig N. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 06 /
DENZINGER, Kristen G. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 07 /
RIESTENBERG, Paul F. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 08 /
LOCKE, David M. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 09 /
GEE, Jacob S. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 10 /
DENNIS, Joseph 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | 11 /
MADAN, Ashvani K. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45242 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Bettridge, Paul Sebastian Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 17725133.7 | 15.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US32626 | Priority number, date | US201615163824 | 25.05.2016 Original published format: US201615163824 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017205094 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3463119 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/32, A61B18/00, A61B17/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
A61B17/320068 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1644 (KR);
A61B17/3211 (KR,US);
A61B18/00 (KR);
A61B2017/00084 (KR,US);
A61B2017/00154 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2017/1651 (KR);
A61B2017/320075 (KR);
A61B2017/320084 (EP,US);
A61B2017/320095 (KR);
A61B2017/320098 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00005 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00029 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00744 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | MERKMALE UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER ZUFUHR VON KÜHLFLÜSSIGKEIT ZUM ENDEFFEKTOR EINES CHIRURGISCHEN ULTRASCHALLINSTRUMENTS | [2019/15] | English: | FEATURES AND METHODS TO CONTROL DELIVERY OF COOLING FLUID TO END EFFECTOR OF ULTRASONIC SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2019/15] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR COMMANDER LA DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT À UN EFFECTEUR TERMINAL D'UN INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL À ULTRASONS | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2960954B (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [X]US2009036914 (HOUSER KEVIN L [US]) [X] 1,3-5,11-14 * paragraphs [0050] , [0 52] , [0 82] , [0 84] , [ 101] , [ 105] - [0108] - [ 115] , [ 126] , [ 134]; figures 1, 4, 7A-17, 20-26 *; | [I]US2011172691 (OYOLA ARNOLD E [US], et al) [I] 18,19 * paragraphs [0052] - [0055] - [0090]; figures 2-2D *; | [IY]US2011196404 (DIETZ TIMOTHY G [US], et al) [I] 20 * paragraphs [0076] , [0 78] , [0 81] , [0 84] , [0 85] , [0 89]; figures 1-2, 13-43 * [Y] 15-17; | [XYI]EP2572660 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [X] 1,3-6,9-12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 27] - [0036] - [0 43]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 15-17 [I] 7,8; | [X]EP2848215 (COVIDIEN LP [US]) [X] 1-4,11,12 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 34] - [0040]; figures 1-11 * | by applicant | US5322055 | US5873873 | US5980510 | US6325811 | US6773444 | US6783524 | US2006079874 | US2007191713 | US2007282333 | US2008200940 | US2009105750 | US2010069940 | US2011015660 | US2011087212 | US2012029546 | US2012112687 | US2012116265 | US2013090576 | US8591459 | US2015148832 | US20100410603 |