EP3449154 - COUPLING PIECE ELEMENT FOR A JOINING SHACKLE FOR ANCHOR CHAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmiedestück-Vertrieb Feuerstein GmbH Beuler Höhe 16-20 45525 Hattingen / DE | [2019/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUKENBERG, Till Ferdinand-Krüger-Strasse 71 44879 Bochum / DE | 02 /
SVERDLOVA, Nina Mittelstrasse 47 44575 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2019/10] | 01 /
STUKENBERG, Till Ferdinand-Krüger-Strasse 71 44879 Bochum / DE | ||
02 /
SVERDLOVA, Nina Auf dem Felde 11 58455 Witten / DE | Representative(s) | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Tarvenkorn & Wickord Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bernhard-Ernst-Straße 12 48155 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/10] | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Tarvenkorn & Wickord Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Haus Sentmaring 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 17725855.5 | 28.04.2017 | [2019/10] | WO2017DE100359 | Priority number, date | DE201610108051 | 29.04.2016 Original published format: DE102016108051 | [2019/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017186236 | Date: | 02.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3449154 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3449154 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16G15/04 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
F16G15/04 (EP,US);
F16G13/14 (EP);
F16G15/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPPELSTEINELEMENT FÜR EINEN KENTERSCHÄKEL FÜR ANKERKETTEN | [2019/10] | English: | COUPLING PIECE ELEMENT FOR A JOINING SHACKLE FOR ANCHOR CHAINS | [2019/10] | French: | ÉTAI DESTINÉ À UNE MANILLE KENTER POUR CHAÎNES D'ANCRES | [2019/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/10] | 29.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2017 | AL | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | AT | 28.04.2022 | IE | 28.04.2022 | LU | 28.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.04.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
AT | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.04.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
AT | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.04.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
AT | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
AT | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | EE | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 |