EP3616318 - INVERTED DOHERTY POWER AMPLIFIER WITH LARGE RF FRACTIONAL AND INSTANTANEOUS BANDWIDTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/10] | INVERTED DOHERTY POWER AMPLIFIER WITH LARGE RF FRACTIONAL AND INSTANTANEOUS BANDWITHS | ||
[2023/26] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MACOM Technology Solutions Holdings, Inc. 100 Chelmsford Street Lowell, Massachusetts 01851 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUISSE, Gerard 31 Rue Jules Mazellier 31100 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
CASSOU, Christian 51 Rue Gaston Doumergue 31170 Tournefeuille / FR | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 17726354.8 | 24.04.2017 | [2020/10] | WO2017IB00604 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018197917 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3616318 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3616318 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/42, H03F1/56, H03F3/195, H03F1/02, H03F3/21, H03F3/24, H03F3/213, H03F3/60 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H03F3/195 (EP);
H03F1/0288 (EP,US);
H03F1/42 (EP);
H03F1/565 (EP,US);
H03F3/211 (EP,US);
H03F3/213 (EP);
H03F3/245 (EP);
H03F3/601 (EP);
H03F3/604 (EP);
H03F2200/222 (US);
H03F2200/36 (EP);
H03F2200/387 (US);
H03F2200/451 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/10] | H03F3/195, H03F1/02, H03F3/24, H03F3/21, H03F3/213, H03F3/60, H03F1/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INVERTIERTER DOHERTY-LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER MIT GROSSEN HF-FRAKTIONALEN UND UNMITTELBAREN BANDBREITEN | [2020/10] | English: | INVERTED DOHERTY POWER AMPLIFIER WITH LARGE RF FRACTIONAL AND INSTANTANEOUS BANDWIDTHS | [2023/26] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE DOHERTY INVERSÉ À GRANDES LARGEURS DE BANDE FRACTIONNAIRES RF ET INSTANTANÉES | [2020/10] |
Former [2020/10] | INVERTED DOHERTY POWER AMPLIFIER WITH LARGE RF FRACTIONAL AND INSTANTANEOUS BANDWITHS | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 21.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2023 | 19.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2013093534 (MEI CHONG [US]) [I] 1-43 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032]; figures 7A,7B *; | [A]US2015180428 (PHAM BI [CA], et al) [A] 1-43 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0073]; figures 6-11 *; | [A]US2017085228 (ABDO DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 9-11,30-32 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0108]; figure 27 *; | [A] - Hai-Jin Zhou ET AL, "DESIGN OF AN S-BAND TWO-WAY INVERTED ASYMMETRICAL DOHERTY POWER AMPLIFIER FOR LONG TERM EVOLUTION APPLICATIONS", Progress In Electromagnetics Research Letters, (20130101), pages 73 - 80, URL: http://www.jpier.org/PIERL/pierl39/08.13032010.pdf, (20170825), XP055401428 [A] 1-43 * page 74, paragraph 2 - page 78, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2528/PIERL13032010 | [A] - ANDREI GREBENNIKOV ET AL, "High-Efficiency Doherty Power Amplifiers: Historical Aspect and Modern Trends", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20121201), vol. 100, no. 12, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2012.2211091, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 3190 - 3219, XP011471965 [A] 1-43 * page 3202, paragraph V - page 3203 * * page 3207, paragraph VII - page 3210 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2012.2211091 | Examination | - DAEHYUN KANG ET AL, "30.3% PAE HBT Doherty power amplifier for 2.5~ 2.7 GHz mobile WiMAX", MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST (MTT), 2010 IEEE MTT-S INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100523), ISBN 978-1-4244-6056-4, pages 796 - 799, XP031714062 |