EP3465622 - MOTION-COMPENSATED COMPRESSION OF DYNAMIC VOXELIZED POINT CLOUDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOU, Philip A. Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
DE QUEIROZ, Ricardo L. Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17726437.1 | 18.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US33207 | Priority number, date | US201615168019 | 28.05.2016 Original published format: US201615168019 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017209961 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465622 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06T9/00, H04N19/597, H04N19/50, H04N19/176, H04N19/147, H04N19/107, H04N19/19, H04N19/86 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H04N19/51 (EP);
H04N19/597 (US);
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
G06T9/004 (EP,US);
H04N19/107 (EP,US);
H04N19/119 (US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/15 (US);
H04N19/176 (EP,US);
H04N19/19 (EP,US);
H04N19/43 (US);
H04N19/50 (EP,US);
H04N19/521 (US);
H04N19/82 (US);
H04N19/86 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSKOMPENSIERTE KOMPRESSION VON DYNAMISCHEN VOXELISIERTEN PUNKTWOLKEN | [2019/15] | English: | MOTION-COMPENSATED COMPRESSION OF DYNAMIC VOXELIZED POINT CLOUDS | [2019/15] | French: | COMPRESSION À COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT DE NUAGES DE POINTS VOXELISÉS DYNAMIQUES | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 12.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - RICARDO L DE QUEIROZ ET AL, "MPEG 115th Meeting Geneva, attached to input document m38675", MPEG 115TH MEETING GENEVA, (20160525), XP055395321 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [XI] - PHILIP A CHOU ET AL, "Rate-Distortion Optimized Coder for Dynamic Voxelized Point Clouds", 115. MPEG MEETING; 30-5-2016 - 3-6-2016; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20160525), no. m38675, XP030067027 [X] 1-3,9,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 8 | [XI] - Ricardo L De Queiroz ET AL, "Motion-Compensated Compression of Dynamic Voxelized Point Clouds Published In Transactions on Image Processing, submitted for possible publication Journal Transactions on Image Processing, submitted for possible publication", (20160401), URL: https://www.microsoft.com/en-us/research/publication/motion-compensated-compression-of-dynamic-voxelized-point-clouds/#, (20170801), XP055395120 [X] 1-3,7,9,10,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 8 | [L] - MPEG, "Geneva Meeting - Document Register", MPEG 115TH MEETING GENEVA, (20160711), XP055395305 [L] * page 18, line m38675 - page 18 * | [Y] - CHA ZHANG ET AL, "Point cloud attribute compression with graph transform", 2014 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20141027), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2014.7025414, pages 2066 - 2070, XP032966955 [Y] 1-6,8,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2014.7025414 | [XDY] - THANOU DORINA ET AL, "Graph-based motion estimation and compensation for dynamic 3D point cloud compression", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20150927), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2015.7351401, pages 3235 - 3239, XP032827070 [XD] 9 * the whole document * [Y] 1-6,8,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2015.7351401 | [X] - MULLER K ET AL, "Rate-distortion-optimized predictive compression of dynamic 3D mesh sequences", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0923-5965, (20061001), pages 812 - 828, (20061001), XP027934259 [X] 1,2,4,8,9,14,15 * abstract * * page 814, paragraph 2 - page 818; figure 6 * | by applicant | - S. HADFIELD; R. BOWDEN, "Scene particles: Unregularized particle based scene flow estimation", IEEE TRANS. PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (2014), vol. 36, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2013.162, pages 564 - 576, XP011538947 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2013.162 | - "Computing range flow from multi-modal Kinect data", J.-M. GOTTFRIED; J. FEHR; C. S. GARBE, Advances in Visual Computing, SPRINGER, (2011), pages 758 - 767 | - X. ZHANG; D. CHEN; Z. YUAN; N. ZHENG, "Dense scene flow based on depth and multichannel bilateral filter", SPRINGER COMPUTER VISION (ACCV, (2012), pages 140 - 151, XP047027060 | - J. QUIROGA; T. BROX; F. DEVERNAY; J. CROWLEY, "Dense semi-rigid scene flow estimation from RGBD images", SPRINGER COMPUTER VISION (ECCV, (2014), pages 567 - 582 | - Y. NIU; A. DICK; M. BROOKS, "Compass rose: A rotational robust signature for optical flow computation", IEEE TRANS. CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, (201401), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/TCSVT.2013.2276854, pages 63 - 73, XP011536722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2013.2276854 | - C. LOOP; C. ZHANG; Z. ZHANG, "Real-time high-resolution sparse voxelization with application to image-based modeling", HIGH-PERFORMANCE GRAPHICS CONF., (2013), pages 73 - 79 |