EP3458700 - PISTON HAVING AN UNDERCROWN SURFACE WITH INSULATING COATING AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenneco Inc. 500 North Field Drive Lake Forest, IL 60045 / US | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUO, Eduardo 4267 Spring Lake Blvd. Ann Arbor MI 48108 / US | 02 /
LINETON, Warran, Boyd 17800 Waterloo Road Chelsea MI 48118 / US | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/13] | Application number, filing date | 17726462.9 | 19.05.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017US33444 | Priority number, date | US201662339053P | 19.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662339053 P | US201715598564 | 18.05.2017 Original published format: US201715598564 | [2019/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017201354 | Date: | 23.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458700 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/10 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
F02F3/10 (EP,KR,US);
C23C30/00 (KR,US);
F02F3/0069 (KR,US);
F02F3/18 (KR,US);
F02F2200/00 (KR,US);
F05C2251/048 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Title | German: | KOLBEN MIT EINER UNTERBODENFLÄCHE MIT ISOLIERENDER BESCHICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/13] | English: | PISTON HAVING AN UNDERCROWN SURFACE WITH INSULATING COATING AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2019/13] | French: | PISTON POURVU D'UNE SURFACE DE SOUS-COURONNE POURVU D'UN REVÊTEMENT ISOLANT ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CE DERNIER | [2019/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 26.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 22.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0457650U (-) [X] 1-3,17-20,34 * figure - *; | [Y]GB2307193 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 4-14,21-31 * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [XYI]JP2014034917 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [X] 1-3,15,18-20,32 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] * * figure - * [Y] 4-14,21-31 [I] 16,17,33,34; | [E]WO2017087433 (FEDERAL-MOGUL CORP [US]) [E] 1-4,15,16,18-21,32,33* paragraphs [0022] - [0025] * |