EP3455683 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING TOOL-RELATED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mimatic GmbH Westendstrasse 3 87488 Betzigau / DE | [2019/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOPPE, Karl-Heinz Sonnenbichl 38 Oy-Mittelberg 87466 / DE | [2022/44] |
Former [2019/12] | 01 /
SCHOPPE, Karl-Heinz Sonnenbichl 38 Qy-Mittelberg 87466 / DE | Representative(s) | VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB Edisonstraße 2 87437 Kempten / DE | [2022/44] |
Former [2019/12] | Hoppe, Lars VKK Patentanwälte PartG mbB Edisonstraße 2 87437 Kempten / DE | Application number, filing date | 17726560.0 | 10.05.2017 | [2019/12] | WO2017EP61209 | Priority number, date | DE201610108644 | 10.05.2016 Original published format: DE102016108644 | [2019/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017194617 | Date: | 16.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3455683 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3455683 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/4065 | [2019/12] | CPC: |
G05B19/4065 (EP);
G05B2219/37252 (EP);
G05B2219/37256 (EP);
G05B2219/50347 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON WERKZEUGBEZOGENEN DATEN | [2019/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING TOOL-RELATED DATA | [2019/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER DES DONNÉES RELATIVES À UN OUTIL | [2019/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/12] | 10.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.06.2022 | 30.06.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | AT | 10.05.2023 | GB | 10.05.2023 | IE | 10.05.2023 | LU | 10.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | CH | 31.05.2023 | FR | 31.05.2023 | LI | 31.05.2023 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
GB | 10.05.2023 | ||
IE | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 10.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
FR | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
IE | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 10.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 10.05.2023 | ||
CH | 31.05.2023 | ||
LI | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MC | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
LU | 10.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0036543 (UNIV MASSACHUSETTS [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 8, line 19 - page 12, line 13; figures 1-8 * * page 17, line 18 - page 17, line 24; figure 11 * * page 19, line §17 - page 19, line 32; figure 15 *; | [YA]WO2005038613 (HYDRALIFT AMCLYDE INC [US], et al) [Y] 4,9 * paragraph [0076] *[A] 1; | [YA]US2013097276 (SRIDHAR BHARATH [IN]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1 * [A] 1; | [Y]EP3001265 (PALO ALTO RES CT INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP3002650 (FIBRO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-4 * | Examination | WO2014053048 | DE102013107307 | US2015134733 | - Anonymous, "Datenkompression", Wikipedia, (20140211), pages 1 - 8, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Datenkompression, (20181112), XP055522735 | by applicant | US2005017602 |