EP3465024 - REFRIGERANT VENT RECTIFIER AND EFFICIENCY BOOSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2020/25] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITNEY, Mark 1411 Oak Stream Drive Houston Texas 77043 / US | 02 /
ULRICH, Mark 5357 McCulloch Circle Houston Texas 77056 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Frommberger, Moritz m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17726627.7 | 30.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP63025 | Priority number, date | US201615168314 | 31.05.2016 Original published format: US201615168314 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017207562 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465024 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/00, F25B33/00, F25B43/00, F25B1/10, F25B43/04, F25B5/04 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
F25B1/10 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/08 (KR,US);
F25B43/043 (EP,KR,US);
F25B5/04 (EP,KR,US);
F25B9/002 (EP,KR,US);
F25J1/0052 (EP,KR,US);
F25J1/0085 (EP,KR,US);
F25J1/025 (EP,KR,US);
F25J1/0268 (EP,KR,US);
F25J1/0274 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/0219 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/0238 (EP,KR,US);
F25J3/0252 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2400/13 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2400/23 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2210/12 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2210/42 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2215/62 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2270/12 (EP,KR,US);
F25J2270/42 (KR,US);
F25J2270/60 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | KÄLTEMITTELENTLÜFTUNGSGLEICHRICHTER UND WIRKUNGSGRADVERSTÄRKER | [2019/15] | English: | REFRIGERANT VENT RECTIFIER AND EFFICIENCY BOOSTER | [2019/15] | French: | REDRESSEUR D'ÉVENT DE FRIGORIGÈNE ET AMPLIFICATEUR D'EFFICACITÉ | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 21.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5313805 (BLACKMON WILLIAM S [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 3, line 39 - column 4; figure 1 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 12-14; | [A]US5517825 (MANZ KENNETH W [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 2, line 55 - column 3; figure 1 *; | [YA]WO2009050175 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 23 - page 24; figure 2 * [A] 11-14; | [A]SG190586 (LUMMUS TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * figures 4,6 * |