EP3476011 - FEED-THROUGH TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | LEADTHROUGH TERMINAL | ||
[2023/51] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstraße 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | [2024/19] |
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states Phoenix Contact GmbH & Co. KG Flachsmarktstrasse 8 32825 Blomberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOPPENBURG, Christian Holsteiner Str. 18a 33142 Büren Wewelsburg / DE | 02 /
HABIROV, Dennis Schloßhofstr. 30a 33615 Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
BRACHT, Jan Johannes-Allerkamp-Str.3 33034 Brakel / DE | [2019/18] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [2024/19] |
Former [2019/18] | Gesthuysen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17727255.6 | 06.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017EP63686 | Priority number, date | LU20160093126 | 28.06.2016 Original published format: LU 93126 | [2019/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018001682 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3476011 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3476011 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/74, H01R9/24, H01R4/48, H01R9/26, // H01R13/639 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H01R9/2408 (EP,EA);
H01R13/743 (EP,EA);
H01R9/2616 (EP,EA);
H01R13/6395 (EP,EA);
H01R4/4821 (EP,EA,US);
H01R4/485 (EP,EA,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/18] | H01R13/74, H01R4/48, H01R9/26, H01R9/24, H01R13/639 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] |
Former [2019/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNGSKLEMME | [2019/18] | English: | FEED-THROUGH TERMINAL | [2023/51] | French: | BORNE DE TRAVERSÉE | [2019/18] |
Former [2019/18] | LEADTHROUGH TERMINAL | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 15.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19801260 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [XI]DE10216574 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE20200974U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]); | [A]WO2004088798 (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE], et al); | [A]DE202010010424U (WEIDMUELLER INTERFACE [DE]) | Examination | WO2004088798 | EP1655813 | by applicant | DE19801260 | DE10315661 | EP1333544 | DE202010010424U |