EP3463685 - METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPOUND FOR CHANGING VISCOSITY OF VISCOUS MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mycronic AB PO Box 3141 Nytorpsvägen 9 183 03 Täby / SE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÅRTENSON, Gustaf c/o Mycronic AB Box 3141 183 03 Täby / SE | 02 /
ESSÉN, Lars c/o Mycronic AB Box 3141 183 03 Täby / SE | 03 /
XING, Kezhao c/o Mycronic AB Box 3141 183 03 Täby / SE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Blidefalk, Jenny Mycronic AB P.O. Box 3141 183 03 Täby / SE | Application number, filing date | 17727543.5 | 24.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP62658 | Priority number, date | SE20160030119 | 26.05.2016 Original published format: SE 1630119 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202982 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3463685 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B05C9/06, B05C11/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B05C5/0291 (EP);
B05C11/1034 (EP);
B05C9/06 (EP);
H05K2203/0126 (EP);
H05K3/3485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND VERBINDUNG ZUR ÄNDERUNG DER VISKOSITÄT EINES VISKOSEN MEDIUMS | [2019/15] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND COMPOUND FOR CHANGING VISCOSITY OF VISCOUS MEDIUM | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET COMPOSÉ PERMETTANT DE MODIFIER LA VISCOSITÉ D'UN MILIEU VISQUEUX | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 18.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9810251 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [X] 26 * page 28, line 28 - page 19, line 24 * * page 32, line 12 - line 22 *; | [XDI]EP1760123 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [XD] 1-3,5,6,12,18-22,25-27 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0099]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * [I] 4,7-11,13-17,23,24,28-30; | [X]US2016031030 (BERGSTRÖM ANDREAS [SE], et al) [X] 26* abstract * | by applicant | EP1760123 | US8757511 |