EP3446053 - REFRIGERATION SYSTEM CONTROL AND PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elie Kfoury Aswad, Emilie 6 Vissarionos Street 10672 Athens / GR | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASSOUAD, Bechara Philip 215 Charles Malek Avenue, Elie Kfoury Building Facing Sofil Ashrafieh 2071-4712 / LB | [2019/10] |
Former [2019/09] | 01 /
ASSOUAD, Bechara Philip Hazmieh BBAC Building 6th Floor Beirut Lebanon 30 Hazmieh / LB | Representative(s) | Argyriadis, Korinna 6, Vissarionos Street 10672 Athens / GR | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17727682.1 | 24.03.2017 | [2019/09] | WO2017GR00015 | Priority number, date | US201662319335P | 07.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662319335 P | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017175014 | Date: | 12.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3446053 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3446053 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, F25B3/00, F25B31/02, F25B49/00 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
F25B49/022 (EP,KR,US);
F25B3/00 (EP,KR);
F25B31/02 (EP,KR);
F25B49/005 (EP,KR);
F25B2400/01 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2500/26 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2500/28 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2600/0251 (EP,KR);
F25B2600/23 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG EINES KÜHLSYSTEMS UND SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2019/09] | English: | REFRIGERATION SYSTEM CONTROL AND PROTECTION DEVICE | [2019/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET DE PROTECTION DE SYSTÈME FRIGORIFIQUE | [2019/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 08.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2019 | 31.03.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2157447 (DANFOSS AS); | [X]US2002139133 (HWANG YOON JEI [KR]); | [X]EP1647783 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XI]WO2012027241 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2015045854 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [I]EP2924366 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]EP2933583 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [P]EP3051235 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) | by applicant | US5209076 | US5666815 | US6539734 | US6578373 | US2004194485 | US9194393 |