EP3468503 - MEDICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SHUTTING OFF A BODY CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.M.I. Agency for Medical Innovations GmbH Im Letten 1 6800 Feldkirch / AT | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOHLRIEDER, Martin Kneippgasse 53a 6840 Götzis / AT | 02 /
JABLONOWSKI, Marc Im Haag 14 6923 Lauterach / AT | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Rankweil Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Hörnlingerstraße 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Hofmann, Ralf U., et al Hofmann & Fechner Patentanwälte Hörnlingerstrasse 3 Postfach 5 6830 Rankweil / AT | Application number, filing date | 17728038.5 | 12.05.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017AT00036 | Priority number, date | AT20160000294 | 14.06.2016 Original published format: AT 2942016 | [2019/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017214643 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468503 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A61F2/004 (EP,AT,US);
A61F2/0027 (US);
A61F2230/0065 (US);
A61F2250/0013 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE EINRICHTUNG ZUM ABSPERREN EINES KÖRPERKANALS | [2019/16] | English: | MEDICAL ARRANGEMENT FOR SHUTTING OFF A BODY CHANNEL | [2019/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL POUR FERMER UN CANAL CORPOREL | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 24.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4721509 (CRAGGS MICHAEL D [GB]); | [IY]US4784660 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US]); | [Y]US2009248109 (FORSELL PETER [CH]); | [X]US2010211175 (GOMEZ-LLORENS CHRISTOPHE [FR]) |