EP3464562 - PROCESS FOR GENERATION, IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION OF HUMAN PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES AND CARDIOMYOCYTE SUBPOPULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miltenyi Biotec B.V. & Co. KG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Miltenyi Biotec GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, Kristin Moitzfeld 73 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
ECKARDT, Dominik Diakonissenweg 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
BOSIO, Andreas Hanfweg 17 50939 Köln / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2020/29] | 01 /
BECKER, Kristin Moitzfeld 73 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
ECKARDT, Dominik Diakonissenweg 29 51429 Bergisch Gadbach / DE | |||
03 /
BOSIO, Andreas Hanfweg 17 50939 Köln / DE | |||
Former [2019/15] | 01 /
NOACK, Kristin Moitzfeld 73 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02 /
ECKARDT, Dominik Diakonissenweg 29 51429 Bergisch Gadbach / DE | |||
03 /
BOSIO, Andreas Hanfweg 17 50939 Köln / DE | Representative(s) | Biervert, Christian c/o Miltenyi Biotec B.V. & Co. KG Corporate Legal Department Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2019/15] | Biervert, Christian Miltenyi Biotec GmbH Corporate Legal Department Friedrich-Ebert-Straße 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 17728118.5 | 30.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP63047 | Priority number, date | EP20160172528 | 01.06.2016 Original published format: EP 16172528 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017207576 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464562 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464562 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/077, C12N5/0735, C12N5/074, A61P9/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
C12N5/0657 (EP,US);
A61K35/34 (US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
G01N33/5005 (US);
G01N33/582 (US);
C12N2500/98 (EP);
C12N2501/115 (EP,US);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/16 (EP,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP);
C12N2501/727 (EP);
C12N2501/999 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | C12N5/077, C12N5/0735, C12N5/074 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG, IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ISOLIERUNG VON MENSCHLICHEN PLURIPOTENTEN STAMMZELLEN AUS KARDIOMYOZYTEN UND KARDIOMYOZYT-SUBPOPULATIONEN | [2019/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR GENERATION, IDENTIFICATION AND ISOLATION OF HUMAN PLURIPOTENT STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES AND CARDIOMYOCYTE SUBPOPULATIONS | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA GÉNÉRATION, L'IDENTIFICATION ET L'ISOLEMENT DE CARDIOMYOCYTES ISSUS DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES HUMAINES ET DES SOUS-POPULATIONS DE CARDIOMYOCYTES | [2021/17] |
Former [2019/15] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION, D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'ISOLEMENT DE CARDIOMYOCYTES DÉRIVÉS DE CELLULES SOUCHES PLURIPOTENTES HUMAINES ET SOUS-POPULATIONS DE CARDIOMYOCYTES | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 17.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2017 | AL | 15.09.2021 | AT | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | CZ | 15.09.2021 | DK | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | FI | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | MT | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | NO | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | IE | 30.05.2022 | LU | 30.05.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
MK | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.05.2017 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
DK | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
AT | 15.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
CZ | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 15.09.2021 | |
FI | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
NO | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
NO | 15.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]WO2012135253 (GERON CORP [US], et al) [XD] 14 * the whole document * * page 58 - page 61; examples VI-VII * * claim 50 * [Y] 2,6-13,15 [I] 1,3-5; | [XY]WO2012133954 (UNIV KYOTO [JP], et al) [X] 14 * the whole document * * claims 1-12 * [Y] 6-12,15; | [XY]WO2014014119 (UNIV KYOTO [JP]) [X] 14 * the whole document * * claims 1-15 * [Y] 6-12,15; | [XY] - DUBOIS NICOLE C ET AL, "SIRPA is a specific cell-surface marker for isolating cardiomyocytes derived from human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, GALE GROUP INC, US, vol. 29, no. 11, doi:10.1038/NBT.2005, ISSN 1087-0156, (20111101), pages 1011 - 1019, (20111023), XP009167979 [X] 14 * the whole document * * page 1016, paragraph 2; figure 7 * [Y] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2005 | [XY] - CHUNHUI XU, "Differentiation and enrichment of cardiomyocytes from human pluripotent stem cells", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, GB, vol. 52, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.YJMCC.2012.03.012, ISSN 0022-2828, (20120320), pages 1203 - 1212, (20120330), XP028482910 [X] 14 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6-13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yjmcc.2012.03.012 | by applicant | WO03046141 | WO2009072003 | US2009275132 | WO2012024782 | WO2012135253 | WO2013063305 | US2014134733 | US2014193909 | US2015184129 | - BURRIDGE ET AL., "Chemically defined generation of human cardiomyocytes", NAT METHODS, (2014), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth.2999, pages 855 - 60, XP055239845 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.2999 | - DUBOIS ET AL., "SIRPA is a specific cell-surface marker for isolating cardiomyocytes derived from human pluripotent stem cells", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (2011), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1038/NBT.1005, pages 1011 - 8, XP002694003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1005 | - FUERSTENAU-SHARP ET AL., "Generation of highly purified human cardiomyocytes from peripheral blood mononuclear cell-derived induced pluripotent stem cells.", PLOS ONE, (2015), vol. 10, no. 5, page E0126596, XP002763626 | - PICCINI ET AL., "Human pluripotent stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes: Genome-wide expression profiling of long-term in vitro maturation in comparison to human heart tissue", GENOM DATA, (2015), vol. 4, pages 69 - 72 | - SKELTON ET AL., "CD13 and ROR2 Permit Isolation of Highly Enriched Cardiac Mesoderm from Differentiating Human Embryonic Stem Cells", STEM CELL REPORTS., (2016), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 95 - 108 | - TOHYAMA ET AL., "Distinct metabolic flow enables large-scale purification of mouse and human pluripotent stem cell-derived cardiomyocytes", CELL STEM CELL., (2013), vol. 12, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.stem.2012.09.013, pages 127 - 37, XP055175411 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2012.09.013 | - UOSAKI ET AL., "Efficient and scalable purification of cardiomyocytes from human embryonic and induced pluripotent stem cells by VCAM1 surface expression.", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 8, page E23657 | - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., "Transcriptome of human foetal heart compared with cardiomyocytes from pluripotent stem cells", DEVELOPMENT, (2015), vol. 142, pages 3231 - 8 | - XU ET AL., "Highly enriched cardiomyocytes from human embryonic stem cells", CYTOTHERAPY, (2008), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1080/14653240802105307, pages 376 - 89, XP002707706 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/14653240802105307 | - ZHANG ET AL., "Universal cardiac induction of human pluripotent stem cells in two and three-dimensional formats: implications for in vitro maturation.", STEM CELLS, (2015), vol. 33, pages 1456 - 69 | EP20140167201 |