EP3464938 - SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR SUPPORTING A CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preformed Line Products Co. 660 Beta Drive Mayfield Village, OH 44143 / US | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBAN, Rebecca, Marie 660 Beta Drive Mayfield Village OH 44143 / US | 02 /
HANNEMAN, Andrew, James 660 Beta Drive Mayfield Village OH 44143 / US | 03 /
VARGO, Phillip, Steven 660 Beta Drive Mayfield Village OH 44143 / US | 04 /
MAIANO, Bruno, Aldo 660 Beta Drive Mayfield Village OH 44143 / US | 05 /
LAMBERT, Théo, Dominique 660 Beta Drive Mayfield Village OH 44143 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [2024/28] |
Former [2019/15] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 17728737.2 | 25.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US34580 | Priority number, date | US201662341335P | 25.05.2016 Original published format: US 201662341335 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017205693 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464938 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464938 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/02, F16G11/14, H02G7/05 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
F16G11/02 (EP,US);
H02G3/02 (CN);
F16L3/1226 (US);
F16G11/146 (EP,US);
F16L3/06 (US);
F16L3/08 (US);
F16L3/1211 (US);
F16L3/26 (US);
H02G3/0437 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | F16G11/02, F16G11/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZSTRUKTUR ZUM STÜTZEN EINES KABELS | [2019/15] | English: | SUPPORT STRUCTURE FOR SUPPORTING A CABLE | [2019/15] | French: | STRUCTURE DE SUPPORT POUR SOUTENIR UN CÂBLE | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2021 | Observations by third parties | 19.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20209618.6 / EP3800370 | EP20209624.4 / EP3800371 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | FR | Licencee: | Preformed Line Products (France) 1 rue des Champs Odés 78200 Buchelay / FR | Date: | 22.06.2023 | [2023/34] | Cited in | International search | [X]US2100569 (RUSSELL WILLIAM C); | [XI]US2241221 (BUSSELL WILLIAM C); | [X]US2354280 (RUSSELL WILLIAM C); | [X]DE944227 (THYSSEN HUETTE AG); | [X]US3174780 (SHAPIRO HYMAN A) | Examination | WO03007031 | WO2006085871 | WO2015150022 | other | EP3464938 |