EP3463650 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING PROTECTED RESIN CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IQatalyst B.V. Strijkviertel 61 3454 PK De Meern / NL | [2024/16] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states BASF Corporation 100 Park Avenue Florham Park, NJ 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSSELINK, Rob Groningensingel 1 6835 EA Arnhem / NL | 02 /
TERÖRDE, Robert Johan Andreas Maria c/o Strijkviertel 61 3454 PK De Meern / NL | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 17729202.6 | 31.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017IB53194 | Priority number, date | NL20162016865 | 31.05.2016 Original published format: NL 2016865 | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017208164 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3463650 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/755, B01J37/02, B01J37/04, B01J37/18, B01J21/06, B01J21/08, B01J21/10, B01J21/12, B01J21/14, B01J33/00, B01J35/00, B01J35/02, B01J35/10 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B01J23/755 (EP,KR,US);
B01J33/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0219 (EP,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J21/10 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J21/14 (EP,US);
B01J35/392 (EP,US);
B01J35/399 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/50 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/615 (EP,US);
B01J35/635 (EP,US);
B01J37/0072 (KR);
B01J37/0217 (EP,US);
B01J37/0221 (EP,US);
B01J37/023 (EP,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,US);
B01J37/18 (EP,US);
C08L25/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESCHÜTZTEN HARZKATALYSATOREN | [2019/15] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING PROTECTED RESIN CATALYSTS | [2019/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CATALYSEURS À BASE DE RÉSINE PROTÉGÉS | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 24.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2842504 (JONES RUFUS V); | [Y]US6294498 (DARCISSAC JOAN [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2004035204 (ENGELHARD CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2004157731 (WOLFE DAVID C [US], et al); | [A]US2006276577 (LEE CHANG S [KR], et al); | [Y]WO2013088411 (BASF CORP [US]); | [A]WO2015008247 (BASF CORP [US]) | by applicant | WO0136093 | US6281163 | US6294498 | WO2004035204 | WO2011133037 | WO2013088411 |