EP3469120 - HIGH RESISTIVITY SINGLE CRYSTAL SILICON INGOT AND WAFER HAVING IMPROVED MECHANICAL STRENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlobalWafers Co., Ltd. No. 8 Industrial East Road 2 Science-Based Industrial Park Hsinchu, Taiwan / TW | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASAK, Soubir 501 Pearl Drive St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | 02 /
PEIDOUS, Igor 501 Pearl Drive St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | 03 /
HUDSON, Carissima Marie 501 Pearl Drive St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | 04 /
LEE, HyungMin 501 Pearl Drive St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | 05 /
KIM, ByungChun 501 Pearl Drive St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | 06 /
FALSTER, Robert J. 501 Pearl Drive St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Parchmann, Stefanie Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Parchmann, Stefanie Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17729735.5 | 06.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017US36061 | Priority number, date | US201662347143P | 08.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662347143 P | US201662347145P | 08.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662347145 P | [2019/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017214084 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3469120 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3469120 | Date: | 02.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/06, C30B15/30 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C30B15/007 (US);
C30B15/10 (US);
C30B15/30 (CN);
C30B15/305 (EP,KR,US);
C30B30/04 (CN);
H01L21/02005 (US);
H01L21/02123 (US);
H01L21/28167 (US);
H01L31/0288 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHOHMIGE MONOKRISTALLINE SILICIUMBARREN UND WAFER MIT VERBESSERTER MECHANISCHER FESTIGKEIT | [2019/16] | English: | HIGH RESISTIVITY SINGLE CRYSTAL SILICON INGOT AND WAFER HAVING IMPROVED MECHANICAL STRENGTH | [2019/16] | French: | LINGOT ET PLAQUETTE DE SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN À RÉSISTIVITÉ ÉLEVÉE PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSISTANCE MÉCANIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 04.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21217094.8 / EP3995608 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2017 | AL | 02.02.2022 | AT | 02.02.2022 | CY | 02.02.2022 | CZ | 02.02.2022 | DK | 02.02.2022 | EE | 02.02.2022 | ES | 02.02.2022 | FI | 02.02.2022 | HR | 02.02.2022 | IT | 02.02.2022 | LT | 02.02.2022 | LV | 02.02.2022 | MC | 02.02.2022 | MK | 02.02.2022 | MT | 02.02.2022 | NL | 02.02.2022 | PL | 02.02.2022 | RO | 02.02.2022 | RS | 02.02.2022 | SE | 02.02.2022 | SI | 02.02.2022 | SK | 02.02.2022 | SM | 02.02.2022 | TR | 02.02.2022 | BG | 02.05.2022 | NO | 02.05.2022 | GR | 03.05.2022 | IS | 02.06.2022 | PT | 02.06.2022 | GB | 06.06.2022 | IE | 06.06.2022 | LU | 06.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.06.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
TR | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
GB | 06.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.06.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
MK | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
GB | 06.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.06.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CY | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
GB | 06.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.06.2017 | |
AL | 02.02.2022 | ||
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
GB | 06.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
IT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
GB | 06.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
GB | 06.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SI | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
MC | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 02.02.2022 | |
AT | 02.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SK | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
CZ | 02.02.2022 | ||
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
EE | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RO | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
SM | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
DK | 02.02.2022 | ||
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
IS | 02.06.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
FI | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 02.02.2022 | |
ES | 02.02.2022 | ||
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
LV | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
PL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
GR | 03.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 02.02.2022 | |
HR | 02.02.2022 | ||
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
RS | 02.02.2022 | ||
SE | 02.02.2022 | ||
BG | 02.05.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 02.02.2022 | |
LT | 02.02.2022 | ||
NL | 02.02.2022 | ||
NO | 02.05.2022 | ||
PT | 02.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 02.02.2022 | |
NO | 02.05.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004003769 (TAMATSUKA MASARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * examples 1-2; claims 1-5 *; | [X]US2016108551 (BASAK SOUBIR [US], et al) [X] 1-4,17-36 * the whole document *; | [A] - PORRINI M ET AL, "Growth of Large Diameter High Purity Silicon Single Crystals with the MCZ Method for Power Devices Applications", EPE-MADEP. MADEP SYMPOSIUM ON MATERIALS AND DEVICES FOR POWERELECTRONICS. EPE EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON POWER ELECTRONICS ANDAPPLICATIONS. MADEP AND JOINT EPE-MADEP SESS, XX, XX, (19910902), pages 090 - 093, XP009104956 [A] 1-48 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1087041 | JP2005306653 | - Tetsuo Fukuda ET AL, "Mechanical strength of silicon crystals with oxygen and/or germanium impurities", Applied Physics Letters, US, (19920309), vol. 60, no. 10, doi:10.1063/1.107399, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1184 - 1186, XP055745724 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.107399 | - H-D CHIOU ET AL, "EFFECTS OF OXYGEN AND NITROGEN ON SLIP IN CZ SILICON WAFERS", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS,, (19840506), vol. 84, no. 1, XP001287240 | by applicant | US5189500 | WO2014190165 | - J. CRY, Growth, (20020000), vol. 243, pages 371 - 374 | - H. S. GAMBLE et al., "Low-loss CPW lines on surface stabilized high resistivity silicon", Microwave Guided Wave Lett., (19990000), vol. 9, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/75.798027, pages 395 - 397, XP000865045 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/75.798027 | - D. LEDERER; R. LOBET; J.-P. RASKIN, "Enhanced high resistivity SOI wafers for RF applications", IEEE Intl. SOI Conf.,, (20040000), doi:doi:10.1109/SOI.2004.1391549, pages 46 - 47, XP010766840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SOI.2004.1391549 | - D. LEDERER; J.-P. RASKIN, "New substrate passivation method dedicated to high resistivity SOI wafer fabrication with increased substrate resistivity", IEEE Electron Device Letters, (20050000), vol. 26, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1109/LED.2005.857730, pages 805 - 807, XP011141447 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LED.2005.857730 | - D. LEDERER et al, "Performance of RF passive structures and SOI MOSFETs transferred on a passivated HR SOI substrate", IEEE International SOI Conference, (20060000), pages 29 - 30 | - "Identification of RF harmonic distortion on Si substrates and its reduction using a trap-rich layer", DANIEL C; KERRET, Silicon Monolithic Integrated Circuits in RF Systems, IEEE Topical Meeting, (20080000), pages 151 - 154 |