EP3468701 - MIXING APPARATUS, PLANT AND METHOD FOR MIXING MATERIALS, IN PARTICULAR POURABLE MATERIALS, AND USE OF THE MIXING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/16] | MIXING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING MATERIALS, IN PARTICULAR POURABLE MATERIALS | ||
[2021/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interbran Baustoff GmbH Wonnegaustr. 155 67550 Worms-Abenheim / DE | [2021/43] |
Former [2019/16] | For all designated states Interbran Systems AG Mainzer Strasse 4 76344 Eggenstein-Leopoldshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜMCHEN, Kurt Bahnhofstrasse 39 53949 Dahlem / DE | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17729856.9 | 13.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017EP64366 | Priority number, date | DE201610110838 | 14.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016110838 | [2019/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017216140 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3468701 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3468701 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B01F7/04, B01F7/00, B01F15/02, B01F15/00, B01F3/18 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
B01F23/60 (EP);
B01F35/714 (EP,US);
B01F27/0726 (EP);
B01F27/70 (EP);
B01F35/187 (EP);
B01F35/53 (EP);
B01F35/71 (EP);
B01F35/71805 (EP,US);
B01F35/75 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHVORRICHTUNG, ANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN VON MATERIALIEN, INSBESONDERE SCHÜTTFÄHIGEN MATERIALIEN, SOMIT VERWENDUNG DER MISCHVORRICHTUNG | [2021/34] | English: | MIXING APPARATUS, PLANT AND METHOD FOR MIXING MATERIALS, IN PARTICULAR POURABLE MATERIALS, AND USE OF THE MIXING APPARATUS | [2021/34] | French: | MÉLANGEUR, INSTALLATION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MÉLANGER DES MATERIAUX, EN PARTICULIER DES MATERIAUX EN VRAC, ET UTILISATION DUDIT MÉLANGEUR | [2021/34] |
Former [2019/16] | MISCHVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN VON MATERIALIEN, INSBESONDERE SCHÜTTFÄHIGEN MATERIALIEN | ||
Former [2019/16] | MIXING APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MIXING MATERIALS, IN PARTICULAR POURABLE MATERIALS | ||
Former [2019/16] | MÉLANGEUR | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 23.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2017 | AL | 12.01.2022 | CY | 12.01.2022 | CZ | 12.01.2022 | DK | 12.01.2022 | EE | 12.01.2022 | ES | 12.01.2022 | FI | 12.01.2022 | HR | 12.01.2022 | IT | 12.01.2022 | LT | 12.01.2022 | LV | 12.01.2022 | MC | 12.01.2022 | MK | 12.01.2022 | NL | 12.01.2022 | PL | 12.01.2022 | RO | 12.01.2022 | RS | 12.01.2022 | SE | 12.01.2022 | SI | 12.01.2022 | SK | 12.01.2022 | SM | 12.01.2022 | BG | 12.04.2022 | NO | 12.04.2022 | GR | 13.04.2022 | IS | 12.05.2022 | PT | 12.05.2022 | GB | 13.06.2022 | IE | 13.06.2022 | LU | 13.06.2022 | BE | 30.06.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 13.06.2017 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
CY | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 13.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 13.06.2017 | |
AL | 12.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 13.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
IT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 13.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
GB | 13.06.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.06.2022 | ||
BE | 30.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
LU | 13.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
IE | 13.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SI | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
MC | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 12.01.2022 | |
CZ | 12.01.2022 | ||
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SK | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 12.01.2022 | |
DK | 12.01.2022 | ||
EE | 12.01.2022 | ||
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RO | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
SM | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | DK | 12.01.2022 | |
ES | 12.01.2022 | ||
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
IS | 12.05.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
FI | 12.01.2022 | ||
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
LV | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
PL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
GR | 13.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
HR | 12.01.2022 | ||
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
RS | 12.01.2022 | ||
SE | 12.01.2022 | ||
BG | 12.04.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 12.01.2022 | |
LT | 12.01.2022 | ||
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
PT | 12.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 12.01.2022 | |
NL | 12.01.2022 | ||
NO | 12.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 12.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US934603 (GEDGE JULIUS F [US]) [X] 1-6,10-12,15,20-25,27,28,33 * page 1, line 8 - line 100 * * figure - * [A] 7-9,19 [I] 29-32; | [XI]EP0046569 (DRAISWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-12,15,19,20,23-25,27-30,34 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 5, line 34 - page 6, line 26 * * page 9, line 28 - page 10, line 14 * * figure - * [I] 31-33; | [AD]DE4002099 (DRAISWERKE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [XAI]US5580170 (HOLLEY CARL A [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11,19-25,27-33 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 31 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 9,12 [I] 15; | [XI]EP0805008 (CMP SPA [IT]) [X] 1-8,10-12,15,19,20,23-25,27-30,34 * column 1, line 3 - line 25 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 15 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 31-33; | [XAI]US5738439 (FLOWER ARNOLD B [CA]) [X] 1-6,9-11,20,21,23-25,33 * column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * column 2, line 8 - line 40 * * column 3, line 7 - line 36 * * figure - * [A] 7,8,12,15,19,22 [I] 27-32; | [XA]US6551401 (WINISTORFER JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1-11,15,19,20,23-25,27-32 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 36 * * figure - * [A] 12,21,22,33 | by applicant | DE4002099 |