EP3452985 - NUCLEOLAR STRUCTURE EVALUATION AND MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université Libre de Bruxelles Avenue Franklin Roosevelt 50 1050 Brussels / BE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAFONTAINE, Denis Avenue Léon Fournet, 9-204 1342 Limelette / BE | 02 /
DE VLEESCHOUWER, Christophe Esplanade du Bon Air, 10 5020 Vedrin / BE | 03 /
NICOLAS, Emilien Rue du Moulin, 70B boîte 3 6740 Etalle / BE | 04 /
PARISOT, Pascaline Place Verte 60/201 1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17730378.1 | 03.05.2017 | [2019/11] | WO2017EP60532 | Priority number, date | EP20160168087 | 03.05.2016 Original published format: EP 16168087 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017191187 | Date: | 09.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3452985 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3452985 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G01N33/50 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP);
G01N33/5026 (EP);
G01N33/6875 (EP);
G06T2207/10056 (EP);
G06T2207/20036 (EP);
G06T2207/20076 (EP);
G06T2207/30024 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWERTUNG UND MANIPULATION VON NUKLEOLARER STRUKTUR | [2019/11] | English: | NUCLEOLAR STRUCTURE EVALUATION AND MANIPULATION | [2019/11] | French: | ÉVALUATION ET MANIPULATION DE STRUCTURE NUCLÉOLAIRE | [2019/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2018 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2018 | Examination requested [2019/11] | 28.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2020/23] | 06.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.03.2022 | 10.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 05.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 05.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X] - MARIE-FRANÇOISE O'DONOHUE ET AL, "Functional dichotomy of ribosomal proteins during the synthesis of mammalian 40S ribosomal subunits", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY : JCB, US, (20100906), vol. 190, no. 5, doi:10.1083/jcb.201005117, ISSN 0021-9525, pages 853 - 866, XP055396312 [X] 1 * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.201005117 | [X] - T. TENG ET AL, "Loss of Tumor Suppressor RPL5/RPL11 Does Not Induce Cell Cycle Arrest but Impedes Proliferation Due to Reduced Ribosome Content and Translation Capacity", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY., US, (20130923), vol. 33, no. 23, doi:10.1128/MCB.01174-13, ISSN 0270-7306, pages 4660 - 4671, XP055402814 [X] 1,23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.01174-13 | [X] - GOLOMB LIOR ET AL, "p53 and ribosome biogenesis stress: The essentials", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140418), vol. 588, no. 16, doi:10.1016/J.FEBSLET.2014.04.014, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 2571 - 2579, XP029008738 [X] 1,23 * see section 2;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2014.04.014 | [I] - BURSAC SLADANA ET AL, "Activation of the tumor suppressor p53 upon impairment of ribosome biogenesis", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR BASIS OF DISEASE, (20131026), vol. 1842, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BBADIS.2013.08.014, ISSN 0925-4439, pages 817 - 830, XP028599496 [I] 1,23 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbadis.2013.08.014 | [X] - TAKAO KURODA ET AL, "RNA content in the nucleolus alters p53 acetylation via MYBBP1A : MYBBP1A transduces nucleolar stress signal to p53", EMBO JOURNAL., GB, (20110316), vol. 30, no. 6, doi:10.1038/emboj.2011.23, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1054 - 1066, XP055402775 [X] 1,23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/emboj.2011.23 | [X] - HANNA T. GAZDA ET AL, "Ribosomal Protein L5 and L11 Mutations Are Associated with Cleft Palate and Abnormal Thumbs in Diamond-Blackfan Anemia Patients", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, US, (20081201), vol. 83, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.ajhg.2008.11.004, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 769 - 780, XP055402659 [X] 1,23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ajhg.2008.11.004 | [A] - HAITONG SU ET AL, "Identification of Novel Markers That Demarcate the Nucleolus during Severe Stress and Chemotherapeutic Treatment", PLOS ONE, (20131106), vol. 8, no. 11, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0080237, page e80237, XP055402751 [A] 1,23 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0080237 | [T] - EMILIEN NICOLAS ET AL, "Involvement of human ribosomal proteins in nucleolar structure and p53-dependent nucleolar stress", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20160606), vol. 7, doi:10.1038/ncomms11390, page 11390, XP055402736 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms11390 | Examination | - Pia Muñoz Trallero ET AL, "Visual feature extraction to discriminate nucleolus phenotypes in fluorescence microscopy", Thesis submitted to the Ecole Polytechnique de Louvain in partial fulfillment for the degree of Electrical Engineering, (20140101), URL: https://upcommons.upc.edu/bitstream/handle/2099.1/22748/thesis_PiaMuñoz.pdf?sequence=5&isAllowed=y, (20200422), XP055688491 | - Qiang Wu ET AL, "Microscope Image Processing", Microscope Image Processing, Amsterdam [u.a.], Elsevier/Acad. Press, (20080101), pages v - xx, ISBN 978-0-12-372578-3, XP055618641 | by applicant | US2015157254 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, 2nd ed., COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), vol. 1-3 | - TAFFOREAU, L. ET AL., "The complexity of human ribosome biogenesis revealed by systematic nucleolar screening of Pre-rRNA processing factors", MOLECULAR CELL, (2013), vol. 51, pages 539 - 551 | - O'DONOHUE, M.F.; CHOESMEL, V.; FAUBLADIER, M.; FICHANT, G.; GLEIZES, P.E, "Functional dichotomy of ribosomal proteins during the synthesis of mammalian 40S ribosomal subunits", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 190, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.201005117, pages 853 - 866, XP055396312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.201005117 | - ROBLEDO, S. ET AL., "The role of human ribosomal proteins in the maturation of rRNA and ribosome production", RNA, (2008), vol. 14, pages 1918 - 1929 | - CHEN, S.S.; WILLIAMSON, J.R, "Characterization of the ribosome biogenesis landscape in E. coli using quantitative mass spectrometry", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2013), vol. 425, pages 767 - 779 | - SYKES, M.T.; WILLIAMSON, J.R, "A complex assembly landscape for the 30S ribosomal subunit", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOPHYSICS, (2009), vol. 38, pages 197 - 215 | - TALKINGTON, M.W.; SIUZDAK, G.; WILLIAMSON, J.R., "An assembly landscape for the 30S ribosomal subunit", NATURE, (2005), vol. 438, pages 628 - 632 | - MULDER, A.M. ET AL., "Visualizing ribosome biogenesis: parallel assembly pathways for the 30S subunit", SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 330, pages 673 - 677 | - JOMAA, A. ET AL., "Functional domains of the 50S subunit mature late in the assembly process", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2014), vol. 42, pages 3419 - 3435 | - FERREIRA-CERCA, S. ET AL., "Analysis of the in vivo assembly pathway of eukaryotic 40S ribosomal proteins", MOLECULAR CELL, (2007), vol. 28, pages 446 - 457 | - FERREIRA-CERCA, S.; POLL, G.; GLEIZES, P.E.; TSCHOCHNER, H.; MILKEREIT, P., "Roles of eukaryotic ribosomal proteins in maturation and transport of pre-18S rRNA and ribosome function", MOLECULAR CELL, (2005), vol. 20, pages 263 - 275 | - GAMALINDA, M. ET AL., "A hierarchical model for assembly of eukaryotic 60S ribosomal subunit domains", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2014), vol. 28, pages 198 - 210 | - VIOLA, P.; JONES, M., "Robust real-time object detection", IJCV, (2004), vol. 57, pages 137 - 154 | - FELZENSZWALB, P.; GIRSHICK, R.B.; MCALLESTER, D.; RAMANAN, D., "Object detection with discriminatively trained part-based models", IEEE TRANS ON PAMI, (2010), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2009.167, pages 1627 - 1645, XP011327422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2009.167 | - GANGBO, W.; MCCANN, R, "The geometry of optimal transportation", ACTA MATH, (1996), vol. 177, pages 113 - 161 | - HAKER, S.; ANGENENT, S.; TANNENBAUM, A, "Minimizing flows for the monge-kantorovich problem", SIAM J. MATH ANALYSIS, (2003), vol. 35 | - WANG, W.; SLEPCEV, D.; BASU, S.; OZOLEK, J.A.; ROHDE, G.K, "A linear optimal transportation framework for quantifying and visualizing variations in sets of images", INT. J. COMPUTER VISION, (2013), vol. 101, pages 254 - 269 | - OJALA, T.; PIETIKAINEN, M.; HARWOOD, D., "A comparative study of texture measures with classification based on feature distributions", PATTERN RECOGNITION, (1996), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/0031-3203(95)00067-4, pages 51 - 59, XP004000404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(95)00067-4 | - FISHER, R.A., "The use of multiple measurmements in taxonomic problems", ANNALS OF EUGENICS, (1936), vol. 7, pages 179 - 188, XP001059631 | - WELCH, B.L., "The generalization of ''Student's'' problem when several different population variances are involved", BIOMETRIKA, (1947), vol. 34, pages 28 - 35 | - WOLFE, P. ET AL., "Using nuclear morphometry to discriminate the tumorigenic potential of cells: a comparison of statistical methods", CANCER EPIDMIOL BIOMARKERS PREV, (2004), vol. 13, pages 976 - 988 | - HERNANDEZ-VERDUN, D.; ROUSSEL, P.; THIRY, M.; SIRRI, V.; LAFONTAINE, D.L.J., "The nucleolus: structure/function relationship in RNA metabolism", WILEY INTERDISCIPLINARY REVIEWS. RNA, (2010), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1002/wrna.39, pages 415 - 431, XP055396305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/wrna.39 | - BOISVERT, F.M.; VAN KONINGSBRUGGEN, S.; NAVASCUES, J.; LAMOND, A.I., "The multifunctional nucleolus", NATURE REVIEWS. MOLECULAR CELL BIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 8, pages 574 - 585 | - LAFONTAINE, D.L.J., "Noncoding RNAs in eukaryotic ribosome synthesis and function", NATURE STRUCTURAL AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2015), vol. 22, pages 11 - 19 | - STEITZ, T.A., "A structural understanding of the dynamic ribosome machine", NATURE REVIEWS. MOLECULAR CELL BIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 9, pages 242 - 253 | - MELNIKOV, S. ET AL., "One core, two shells: bacterial and eukaryotic ribosomes", NATURE STRUCTURAL & MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2012), vol. 19, pages 560 - 567 | - SCHMEING, T.M.; RAMAKRISHNAN, V, "What recent ribosome structures have revealed about the mechanism of translation", NATURE, (2009), vol. 461, pages 1234 - 1242 | - DANILOVA, N.; GAZDA, H.T, "Ribosomopathies: how a common root can cause a tree of pathologies", DIS MODEL MECH, (2015), vol. 8, pages 1013 - 1026 | - NARLA, A.; EBERT, B.L, "Ribosomopathies: human disorders of ribosome dysfunction", BLOOD, (2010), vol. 115, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2009-10-178129, pages 3196 - 3205, XP055336502 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-10-178129 | - ZHANG, Y.; LU, H, "Signaling to p53: ribosomal proteins find their way", CANCER CELL, (2009), vol. 16, pages 369 - 377 | - CHAKRABORTY, A.; UECHI, T.; KENMOCHI, N., "Guarding the 'translation apparatus': defective ribosome biogenesis and the p53 signaling pathway", WILEY INTERDISCIPLINARY REVIEWS. RNA, (2011), vol. 2, pages 507 - 522 | - LAM, Y.W.; EVANS, V.C.; HEESOM, K.J.; LAMOND, A.I.; MATTHEWS, D.A, "Proteomics analysis of the nucleolus in adenovirus-infected cells", MOLECULAR & CELLULAR PROTEOMICS : MCP, (2010), vol. 9, pages 117 - 130 | - THIRY, M.; LAFONTAINE, D.L.J., "Birth of a nucleolus: the evolution of nucleolar compartments", TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tcb.2005.02.007, pages 194 - 199, XP004842081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcb.2005.02.007 | - LAMAYE, F.; GALLIOT, S.; ALIBARDI, L.; LAFONTAINE, D.L.J.; THIRY, M, "Nucleolar structure across evolution: the transition between bi- and tri-compartmentalized nucleoli lies within the class Reptilia", JOURNAL OF STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 174, pages 352 - 359 | - SIRRI, V.; HERNANDEZ-VERDUN, D.; ROUSSEL, P., "Cyclin-dependent kinases govern formation and maintenance of the nucleolus", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 156, pages 969 - 981 | - LEUNG, A.K. ET AL., "Quantitative kinetic analysis of nucleolar breakdown and reassembly during mitosis in live human cells", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2004), vol. 166, pages 787 - 800 | - DERENZINI, M.; MONTANARO, L.; TRERE, D., "What the nucleolus says to a tumour pathologist", HISTOPATHOLOGY, (2009), vol. 54, pages 753 - 762 | - BYWATER, M.J. ET AL., "Inhibition of RNA polymerase I as a therapeutic strategy to promote cancer-specific activation of p53", CANCER CELL, (2012), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2012.05.019, pages 51 - 65, XP028404161 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2012.05.019 | - PELTONEN, K. ET AL., "A targeting modality for destruction of RNA polymerase I that possesses anticancer activity", CANCER CELL, (2014), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ccr.2013.12.009, pages 77 - 90, XP028808997 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ccr.2013.12.009 | - BOULON, S.; WESTMAN, B.J.; HUTTEN, S.; BOISVERT, F.M.; LAMOND, A.I, "The nucleolus under stress", MOLECULAR CELL, (2010), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2010.09.024, pages 216 - 227, XP055396306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2010.09.024 | - HEIN, N.; HANNAN, K.M.; GEORGE, A.J.; SANIJ, E.; HANNAN, R.D., "The nucleolus: an emerging target for cancer therapy", TRENDS IN MOLECULAR MEDICINE, (2013), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molmed.2013.07.005, pages 643 - 654, XP055396309 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molmed.2013.07.005 | - DE LA CRUZ, J.; KARBSTEIN, K.; WOOLFORD JR, J.L, "Functions of Ribosomal Proteins in Assembly of Eukaryotic Ribosomes In Vivo", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (2015), vol. 84, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev-biochem-060614-033917, pages 93 - 129, XP055396310 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev-biochem-060614-033917 | - O'DONOHUE, M.F.; CHOESMEL, V.; FAUBLADIER, M.; FICHANT, G.; GLEIZES, P.E., "Functional dichotomy of ribosomal proteins during the synthesis of mammalian 40S ribosomal subunits", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 190, doi:doi:10.1083/jcb.201005117, pages 853 - 866, XP055396312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.201005117 | - BAN, N. ET AL., "A new system for naming ribosomal proteins", CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (2014), vol. 24, pages 165 - 169 | - DONATI, G.; PEDDIGARI, S.; MERCER, C.A.; THOMAS, G., "5S ribosomal RNA is an essential component of a nascent ribosomal precursor complex that regulates the Hdm2-p53 checkpoint", CELL REPORTS, (2013), vol. 4, pages 87 - 98 | - SLOAN, K.E.; BOHNSACK, M.T.; WATKINS, N.J., "The 5S RNP couples p53 homeostasis to ribosome biogenesis and nucleolar stress", CELL REPORTS, (2013), vol. 5, pages 237 - 247 | - SASHITAL, D.G. ET AL., "A combined quantitative mass spectrometry and electron microscopy analysis of ribosomal 30S subunit assembly in E. coli", ELIFE, (2014), vol. 3 | - ANGER, A.M. ET AL., "Structures of the human and Drosophila 80S ribosome", NATURE, (2013), vol. 497, doi:doi:10.1038/nature12104, pages 80 - 85, XP055196085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature12104 | - THIRY, M.; LAMAYE, F.; LAFONTAINE, D.L.J, "The nucleolus: when 2 became 3", NUCLEUS, (2011), vol. 2, pages 289 - 293 | - SCHMITZ, M.H. ET AL., "Live-cell imaging RNAi screen identifies PP2A-B55alpha and importin-betal as key mitotic exit regulators in human cells", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 12, pages 886 - 893 | - WILD, T. ET AL., "A protein inventory of human ribosome biogenesis reveals an essential function of exportin 5 in 60S subunit export", PLOS BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 8, page E1000522 | - MULLINEUX, S.T.; LAFONTAINE, D.L.J, "Mapping the cleavage sites on mammalian pre-rRNAs: where do we stand?", BIOCHIMIE, (2012), vol. 94, doi:doi:10.1016/j.biochi.2012.02.001, pages 1521 - 1532, XP028510189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biochi.2012.02.001 | - BUNZ, F. ET AL., "Requirement for p53 and p21 to sustain G2 arrest after DNA damage", SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 282, pages 1497 - 1501 | - SYKES, M.T.; WILLIAMSON, J.R., "A complex assembly landscape for the 30S ribosomal subunit", ANNUAL REVIEW OF BIOPHYSICS, (2009), vol. 38, pages 197 - 215 | - ZHANG, J. ET AL., "Assembly factors Rpf2 and Rrsl recruit 5S rRNA and ribosomal proteins rpL5 and rpLl 1 into nascent ribosomes", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2007), vol. 21, pages 2580 - 2592 | - RUGGERO, D.; PANDOLFI, P.P., "Does the ribosome translate cancer?", NATURE REVIEWS. CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1038/nrc1015, pages 179 - 192, XP055389565 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc1015 | - JAMES, A.; WANG, Y.; RAJE, H.; ROSBY, R.; DIMARIO, P., "Nucleolar stress with and without p53", NUCLEUS, (2014), vol. 5 | - FUMAGALLI, S.; IVANENKOV, V.V.; TENG, T.; THOMAS, G., "Suprainduction of p53 by disruption of 40S and 60S ribosome biogenesis leads to the activation of a novel G2/M checkpoint", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2012), vol. 26, pages 1028 - 1040 | - SUN, X.X.; WANG, Y.G.; XIRODIMAS, D.P.; DAI, M.S., "Perturbation of 60 S ribosomal biogenesis results in ribosomal protein L5- and L11-dependent p53 activation", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (2010), vol. 285, pages 25812 - 25821 | - BURSAC, S. ET AL., "Mutual protection of ribosomal proteins L5 and L11 from degradation is essential for p53 activation upon ribosomal biogenesis stress", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2012), vol. 109, pages 20467 - 20472 | - LO, K.Y. ET AL., "Defining the pathway of cytoplasmic maturation of the 60S ribosomal subunit", MOLECULAR CELL, (2010), vol. 39, pages 196 - 208 | - FERREIRA-CERCA, S.; POLL, G.; GLEIZES, P.E.; TSCHOCHNER, H.; MILKEREIT, P, "Roles of eukaryotic ribosomal proteins in maturation and transport of pre-18S rRNA and ribosome function", MOLECULAR CELL, (2005), vol. 20, pages 263 - 275 | - BEN-SHEM, A. ET AL., "The structure of the eukaryotic ribosome at 3.0 A resolution", SCIENCE, (2011), vol. 334, pages 1524 - 1529 | - KHATTER, H.; MYASNIKOV, A.G.; NATCHIAR, S.K.; KLAHOLZ, B.P., "Structure of the human 80S ribosome", NATURE, (2015), vol. 520, doi:doi:10.1038/nature14427, pages 640 - 645, XP055196081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature14427 | - MADRU, C. ET AL., "Chaperoning 5S RNA assembly", GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (2015), vol. 29, pages 1432 - 1446 | - LEIDIG, C. ET AL., "60S ribosome biogenesis requires rotation of the 5S ribonucleoprotein particle", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (2014), vol. 5, page 3491 | - BASSLER, J. ET AL., "A network of assembly factors is involved in remodeling rRNA elements during preribosome maturation", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (2014), vol. 207, pages 481 - 498 | - YUSUPOV, M.M. ET AL., "Crystal structure of the ribosome at 5.5 A resolution", SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 292, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1060089, pages 883 - 896, XP001026333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1060089 | - RUBBI, C.P.; MILNER, J., "Disruption of the nucleolus mediates stabilization of p53 in response to DNA damage and other stresses", THE EMBO JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 22, pages 6068 - 6077 | - FUMAGALLI, S. ET AL., "Absence of nucleolar disruption after impairment of 40S ribosome biogenesis reveals an rpLl 1-translation-dependent mechanism of p53 induction", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 11, pages 501 - 508 |