EP3465855 - CONTACT-FREE RETAINER FOR AN OMEGA ASSEMBLY FOR MATERIAL BEING BOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HellermannTyton GmbH Großer Moorweg 45 25436 Tornesch / DE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATZ, Ole Am Ochsenweg 7 24850 Hüsby / DE | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Robert, Vincent Aptiv Services France SAS Aptiv EMEA Patent Department Bâtiment Le Raspail - Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations, CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 17730386.4 | 22.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017EP62300 | Priority number, date | DE201620102746U | 23.05.2016 Original published format: DE 202016102746 U | [2019/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017202784 | Date: | 30.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3465855 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/32, B65D63/10, F16L3/233 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B65D63/1072 (EP,KR,US);
H02G3/32 (EP,KR,US);
B65D63/1027 (EP,KR,US);
F16B2/08 (EP,KR,US);
F16B21/065 (EP,KR,US);
F16B21/086 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | KONTAKTFREIE HALTERUNG FÜR EIN BINDEGUT - OMEGA-MONTAGE | [2019/15] | English: | CONTACT-FREE RETAINER FOR AN OMEGA ASSEMBLY FOR MATERIAL BEING BOUND | [2019/15] | French: | MAINTIEN SANS CONTACT D'UN MATÉRIEL À LIGATURER - MONTAGE OMÉGA | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/13] | 24.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3913876 (MCSHERRY WILLIAM E) [A] 1-11,15* the whole document *; | [X]JPH06346907 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) [X] 12,13 * abstract *; | [X]DE20102935U (HELLERMANN TYTON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-11,15 * the whole document *; | [XI]EP1887232 (PANDUIT CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,9-11,15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0031]; figures 1,3, 7, 10, 13 * [I] 7,8; | [X]US2010236030 (DYER EDWARD P [US]) [X] 12-14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0051]; figures 1a-1g *; | [XI]FR3017911 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,8,10,11,15 * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 28; figures 1,3,6 * [I] 5,6,9 | by applicant | US5820083 | EP2541113 | DE202012006840U | EP2816691 | WO2016020027 | US9387611 |