EP3464009 - OVERHEAD TRANSPORTATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POMA 109 Rue Aristide Bergès 38340 Voreppe / FR | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLLET, Alain 15 Clos des Campanules 74940 Annecy le Vieux / FR | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Talbot, Alexandre Cabinet Hecké 28 Cours Jean Jaurès 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2019/15] | Application number, filing date | 17731623.9 | 30.05.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017FR51352 | Priority number, date | FR20160055206 | 07.06.2016 Original published format: FR 1655206 | [2019/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017212141 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3464009 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61B7/02, B61B12/02, B61B3/00 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
B61B7/02 (EP,KR,US);
B61B12/026 (EP,KR,US);
B61B3/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Title | German: | FLURFREIES FÖRDERSYSTEM | [2019/15] | English: | OVERHEAD TRANSPORTATION SYSTEM | [2019/15] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRANSPORT AÉRIEN | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2018 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 29.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 30.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]FR2501608 (PHB WESERHUETTE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * page 10, lines 4-8; figure - * [I] 7,8; | [A]JP3021197B (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD; KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1* abstract *; | [XI]JP3233959B (NIPPON CABLE KK) [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * [I] 5,7,8; | [XI]EP1227022 (HIGH TECHNOLOGY INVEST BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraph [0037]; figures 2,5 * [I] 7; | [XI]WO2011161333 (CREISSELS TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * page 11, lines 12-32; figures 20,21 * [I] 7,8 | by applicant | US2016016593 |