EP3464629 - IMMUNO-PETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2019/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERKA, Jan 3130 Half Dome Drive Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | 02 /
GODWIN, Brian 2877 Caldeira Drive Livermore, California 94550 / US | 03 /
DALLETT, Carolina 1625 Vista Street Oakland, California 94602 / US | 04 /
OZTURK, Sedide 4289 Diavila Avenue Pleasanton, California 94588 / US | 05 /
PLATZER, Joseph 5959 Skyline Boulevard Oakland, California 94611 / US | 06 /
KIM, Seoyoung 733 Bounty Drive 204 Foster City, California 94404 / US | [2019/15] | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [2021/36] |
Former [2019/15] | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17731966.2 | 01.06.2017 | [2019/15] | WO2017US35516 | Priority number, date | US201662344330P | 01.06.2016 Original published format: US 201662344330 P | [2019/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017210469 | Date: | 07.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3464629 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3464629 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6881 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C40B50/06 (US);
C12N15/1065 (US);
C12Q1/68 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/68, C12Q2525/161, C12Q2525/186, C12Q2537/143 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/15] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNO-PETE | [2019/15] | English: | IMMUNO-PETE | [2019/15] | French: | IMMUNO-ENRICHISSEMENT DE CIBLE PAR EXTENSION D'AMORCE (IMMUNO-PETE) | [2019/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/15] | 02.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 10.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.06.2017 | AL | 08.09.2021 | AT | 08.09.2021 | CY | 08.09.2021 | CZ | 08.09.2021 | DK | 08.09.2021 | EE | 08.09.2021 | FI | 08.09.2021 | HR | 08.09.2021 | LT | 08.09.2021 | LV | 08.09.2021 | MC | 08.09.2021 | NL | 08.09.2021 | PL | 08.09.2021 | RO | 08.09.2021 | RS | 08.09.2021 | SE | 08.09.2021 | SI | 08.09.2021 | SK | 08.09.2021 | SM | 08.09.2021 | BG | 08.12.2021 | NO | 08.12.2021 | GR | 09.12.2021 | IS | 08.01.2022 | PT | 10.01.2022 | IE | 01.06.2022 | LU | 01.06.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.06.2017 | |
AL | 08.09.2021 | ||
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 01.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 01.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
IE | 01.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
MC | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
DK | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SI | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 08.09.2021 | |
AT | 08.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
SM | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
NL | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RO | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
IS | 08.01.2022 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
CZ | 08.09.2021 | ||
EE | 08.09.2021 | ||
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
PL | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
SK | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
PT | 10.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 08.09.2021 | |
FI | 08.09.2021 | ||
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
HR | 08.09.2021 | ||
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
LV | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
GR | 09.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
RS | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 08.09.2021 | |
LT | 08.09.2021 | ||
SE | 08.09.2021 | ||
BG | 08.12.2021 | ||
NO | 08.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 08.09.2021 | |
NO | 08.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2010330571 (ROBINS HARLAN S [US], et al) [I] 15-28 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0066] * * tables 1-5 *; | [I]WO2012027503 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al) [I] 1-14,29-33 * page 25, line 13 - line 21 * * page 33, line 9 - line 13 * * page 34, line 10 - line 25 * * page 45, line 9 - page 47, line 3 * * page 80, line 1 - line 9 * * claim 1 *; | [I]WO2012048340 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [I] 15-28 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0112] * * claims 1-35 *; | [I]WO2013086450 (ADAPTIVE BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 15-28 * claims 1-90 * * page 105 - page 111 *; | [I]WO2014145992 (ADAPTIVE BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [I] 1-14,29-33 * paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0213] * * claim 1 *; | [I]US2016138011 (DEWITT WILLIAM [US], et al) [I] 1-14,29-33 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0135] * * claims 1,3-5, 7,16,18-20,24,25 *; | [I] - H. S. ROBINS ET AL, "Comprehensive assessment of T-cell receptor ?-chain diversity in ?? T cells", BLOOD, (20091105), vol. 114, no. 19, doi:10.1182/blood-2009-04-217604, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4099 - 4107, XP055074444 [I] 15-28 * page 4100, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-04-217604 | [A] - FEUCHTENBERGER M ET AL, "Semiquantitative and qualitative assessment of B-lymphocyte V"H repertoire by a fluorescent multiplex PCR", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030501), vol. 276, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(03)00101-7, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 121 - 127, XP004422646 [A] 1-33 * page 122, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(03)00101-7 | [A] - M. RITGEN, "Unmutated immunoglobulin variable heavy-chain gene status remains an adverse prognostic factor after autologous stem cell transplantation for chronic lymphocytic leukemia", BLOOD, (20021031), vol. 101, no. 5, doi:10.1182/blood-2002-06-1744, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2049 - 2053, XP055162107 [A] 1-33 * page 2050, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2002-06-1744 | [A] - PASQUAL N ET AL, "Quantitative and qualitative changes in V-J alpha rearrangements during mouse thymocytes differentiation: implication for a limited T cell receptor alpha chain repertoire", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE, ROCKEFELLER UNIVERSITY PRESS, US, (20021104), vol. 196, no. 9, doi:10.1084/JEM.20021074, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1163 - 1173, XP002322207 [A] 1-33 * page 1164, column r, paragraph l - page 1165, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20021074 | by applicant | US4683202 | US4683195 | US4965188 | WO0132887 | US2010323348 | US8715967 | - BATZER et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19910000), vol. 19, page 5081 | - OHTSUKA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19850000), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608 | - ROSSOLINI et al., Mol. Cell. Probes, (19940000), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - Sambrook et al., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual. 4th Ed., (20120000), vol. 1 | - GLANVILLE et al., PNAS, (20090000), vol. 106, no. 48, pages 20216 - 20221 |