EP3482426 - ORGANIC-INORGANIC HYBRID MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR SILICON SURFACE PASSIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institutt for Energiteknikk Instituttveien 18 2007 Kjeller / NO | For all designated states Universidad Complutense De Madrid Avda. de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | [2022/48] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states Institutt for Energiteknikk Instituttveien 18 2007 Kjeller / NO | ||
For all designated states Universidad Complutense De Madrid Avda. de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CREMADES RODRIGUEZ, Ana c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 02 /
YOU, Chang Chaun c/o IFE Instituttveien 18 2027 Kjeller / NO | 03 /
MAESTRE VAREA, David c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 04 /
STENSRUD MARSTEIN, Erik Tærudstien 10 2020 Skedsmokorset / NO | 05 /
VASQUEZ VILLANUEVA, Geraldo Cristian c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 06 /
HAUG, Halvard c/o IFE Instituttveien 18 2027 Kjeller / NO | 07 /
PIQUERAS DE NORIEGA, Javier c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 08 /
GONSALEZ CLABET, Jose Maria c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 09 /
RAMIREZ CASTELLANO, Julio c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 10 /
TAENO GONZALEZ, Maria c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 11 /
GARCIA TECEDOR, Miguel c/o Universidad Complutense de Madrid Avda de Séneca 2 28040 Madrid / ES | 12 /
KARAZHANOV, Smagul c/o IFE Instituttveien 18 2027 Kjeller / NO | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/48] |
Former [2019/20] | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 17732119.7 | 22.06.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP65449 | Priority number, date | NO20160001150 | 11.07.2016 Original published format: NO 20161150 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018010935 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482426 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3482426 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/46 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
H10K71/12 (EP);
H10K85/1135 (EP,NO);
H01L31/1868 (US);
C09D165/00 (US);
C09D5/24 (US);
C09D7/45 (US);
C09D7/61 (US);
C09D7/67 (US);
C09D7/70 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/20] | H01L51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORGANISCH-ANORGANISCHES HYBRIDMATERIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR SILICIUMOBERFLÄCHENPASSIVIERUNG | [2019/20] | English: | ORGANIC-INORGANIC HYBRID MATERIAL AND METHOD FOR SILICON SURFACE PASSIVATION | [2019/20] | French: | MATÉRIAU HYBRIDE ORGANIQUE-INORGANIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PASSIVATION DE SURFACE EN SILICIUM | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 01.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.11.2022 | AT | 30.11.2022 | CZ | 30.11.2022 | DK | 30.11.2022 | EE | 30.11.2022 | ES | 30.11.2022 | FI | 30.11.2022 | HR | 30.11.2022 | IT | 30.11.2022 | LT | 30.11.2022 | LV | 30.11.2022 | MC | 30.11.2022 | NL | 30.11.2022 | PL | 30.11.2022 | RO | 30.11.2022 | RS | 30.11.2022 | SE | 30.11.2022 | SI | 30.11.2022 | SK | 30.11.2022 | SM | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.03.2023 | IS | 30.03.2023 | PT | 31.03.2023 | IE | 22.06.2023 | LU | 22.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
IE | 22.06.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
LU | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
MC | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SI | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SK | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 30.11.2022 | |
AT | 30.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 30.11.2022 | |
CZ | 30.11.2022 | ||
DK | 30.11.2022 | ||
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RO | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
EE | 30.11.2022 | ||
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 30.11.2022 | |
ES | 30.11.2022 | ||
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
SM | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
NL | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
HR | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
PL | 30.11.2022 | ||
RS | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
IS | 30.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
LV | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.03.2023 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 30.11.2022 | |
FI | 30.11.2022 | ||
LT | 30.11.2022 | ||
SE | 30.11.2022 | ||
PT | 31.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 30.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - SELIN PRIVIDALI-MUCUR ET AL, "Enhancing effects of nanoparticles on polymer-OLED performances", JOURNAL OF NANOPARTICLE RESEARCH ; AN INTERDISCIPLINARY FORUM FOR NANOSCALE SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20120930), vol. 14, no. 10, doi:10.1007/S11051-012-1214-9, ISSN 1572-896X, pages 1 - 11, XP035125689 [X] 1,2,4,7-10 * pages 1214-2, column 2, lines 1-5 * * pages 1214-3, column 1, lines 20-29 * [I] 3,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11051-012-1214-9 | [XYI] - LIU Q ET AL, "Effects of molybdenum oxide molecular doping on the chemical structure of poly(3,4-ethylenedioxythiophene):poly(stylenesulfonate) and on carrier collection efficiency of silicon/poly(3,4-ethylenedioxythiophene):poly(stylenesulfonate) heterojunction solar cells", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, vol. 102, no. 18, doi:10.1063/1.4804298, ISSN 0003-6951, (20130506), pages 183503 - 183503, (20130507), XP012172888 [X] 1,6-8,11 * pages 183503-1, column 1, lines 18-22,31 - column 2, line 22; figures 1-4; table 1 * [Y] 13 [I] 12,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4804298 | [XYI] - SEMALTIANOS N G ET AL, "Modification of the electrical properties of PEDOT:PSS by the incorporation of ZnO nanoparticles synthesized by laser ablation", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 484, no. 4-6, doi:10.1016/J.CPLETT.2009.11.054, ISSN 0009-2614, (20100107), pages 283 - 289, (20091126), XP026817319 [X] 1,7,8 * page 286, column 1, lines 6-13 * * page 284, column 2, line 14 - page 286, column 1, line 21 * [Y] 13 [I] 14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2009.11.054 | [X] - JIAO LI ET AL, "On the mechanism of conductivity enhancement in PEDOT/PSS film doped with multi-walled carbon nanotubes", JOURNAL OF POLYMER RESEARCH, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-CONSULTANTS BUREAU, NL, (20091125), vol. 17, no. 5, ISSN 1572-8935, pages 713 - 718, XP019824720 [X] 5 * page 714, column 1, lines 5-7,14 - column 2, line 40 * * page 716, column 2, line 6 * | Examination | - Fute Zhang ET AL, "Methyl/Allyl Monolayer on Silicon: Efficient Surface Passivation for Silicon-Conjugated Polymer Hybrid Solar Cell", Applied Materials & Interfaces, US, (20130612), vol. 5, no. 11, doi:10.1021/am302893r, ISSN 1944-8244, pages 4678 - 4684, XP055399718 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/am302893r | by applicant | JP2012248635 | CN102875978 | KR20140007082 | KR20140071986 | KR20140132191 | KR20150084702 | CN104867678 | KR101548612B | CN104934540 | - Y. CAO et al., "The role of surface passivation for efficient and photostable PbS quantum dots solar cells", Nature Energy, (20160000), vol. 1, page 16035 | - A.H. IP et al., "Hybrid passivated colloidal quantum dot solids", Nature Nanotechnology, (20120000), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nnano.2012.127, pages 577 - 582, XP055331187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nnano.2012.127 | - B. G. LEE et al., "Excellent passivation and low reflectivity with atomic layer deposited bilayer coatings for n-type silicon solar cells", Thin Solid Films, (20140000), vol. 550, pages 541 - 544 | - Y. LI et al., "Ultrathin flexible planar crystalline-silicon/polymer hybrid solar cell with 5.68 % efficiency by effective passivation", Applied Surface Science, (20160000), vol. 366, doi:doi:10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.01.129, pages 494 - 498, XP029654982 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.01.129 | - D. BIRO et al., "Low temperature passivation of silicon surfaces by polymer films", Solar Energy and Solar Cells, (20020000), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/S0927-0248(01)00094-0, pages 369 - 374, XP004331107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(01)00094-0 | - L. HE et al., "High efficiency planar Si/organic heterojunction hybrid solar cells", Applied Physics Letters, (20120000), vol. 100, page 073503 | - R. YANG et al., "Organic Vapor Passivation of Silicon at Room Temperature", Advanced Materials, (20130000), vol. 25, pages 2078 - 83 | - D. BIRO et al., "Low temperature passivation of silicon surfaces by polymer films", Solar Energy Materials and Solar Cells, (20020000), vol. 71, doi:doi:10.1016/S0927-0248(01)00094-0, pages 369 - 74, XP004331107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-0248(01)00094-0 | - F. ZHAN et al., "Methyl/Allyl Monolayer on Silicon: Efficient Surface Passivation for Silicon-Conjugated Polymer Hybrid Solar Cells", ACS Applied Materials & Interfaces, (20130000), vol. 5, pages 4678 - 84 | - J.P.THOMAS et al., "Interfacial micropore defect formation in PEDOT:PSS-Si hybrid solar cells probed by TOF-SIMS 3D chemical imaging", Anal. Chem., (20130000), vol. 85, pages 6840 - 5 | - B. FAN et al., "Novel ways to significantly enhance the conductivity of transparent PEDOT:PSS", Proc. SPIE 7415, Organic Light Emitting Materials and Devices XIII, (20090000), page 74151Q | - J. P. THOMAS; K. T. LEUNG, Adv. Func. Mater, (20140000), vol. 24, pages 4978 - 4985 | - PEICHEN YU; CHIA-YING TSAI; JAN-KAI CHANG; CHIH-CHUNG LAI; PO-HAN CHEN; YI-CHUN LAI; PEI-TING TSAI; MING-CHIN LI; HUAI-TE PAN; YAN, "13% Efficiency Hybrid Organic/Silicon-Nanowire Heterojunction Solar Cell via Interface Engineering", ACS Nano, (20130000), vol. 7, pages 10780 - 10787 | - YINGFENG LI; PENGFEI FU; RUIKE LI; MEICHENG LI; YOUNAN LUO; DANDAN SONG, "Ultrathin flexible planar crystalline-silicon/polymer hybrid solar cell with 5.68% efficiency by effective passivation", Applied Surface Science, (20160000), vol. 366, doi:doi:10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.01.129, pages 494 - 498, XP029654982 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.apsusc.2016.01.129 | - XUEGONG YU; XINLEI SHEN; XINHUI MU; JIE ZHANG; BAOQUAN SUN; LINGSHENG ZENG; LIFEI YANG; YICHAO WU; HANG HE; DEREN YANG, "High Efficiency OrganiclSilicon-Nanowire Hybrid Solar Cells: Significance of Strong Inversion Layer", Sci. Reports, (20150000), vol. 5, page 17371 | - JIANG SHENG; DAN WANG; SUDONG WU; XI YANG; LI DING; JUYE ZHU; JUNFENG FANG; PINGQI GAO; JICHUN YE, "Ideal rear contact formed via employing a conjugated polymer for Si/PEDOT:PSS hybrid solar cells", RSC Adv., (20160000), vol. 6, page 16010 | - S.-J. WANG; H.-H. PARK, "Study of PEDOT.-PSS-SnO nanocomposite film as an anode for polymer electronics", Journal of Electroceramics, (20070000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1007/s10832-007-9019-4, pages 161 - 65, XP019502648 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10832-007-9019-4 | - Y. LIU,; D. SUN; S. ASKARI; J. PATEL; M. MACIAS-MONTERO; S. MITRA; R. ZHANG; W.-F. LIN; D. MARIOTTI; P. MAGUIRE., "Enhanced Dispersion of TiO Nanoparticles in a TiO /PEDOT:PSS Hybrid Nanocomposite via Plasma-Liquid Interactions", Scientific Reports, (20150000), vol. 5, page 15765 | - K. H. YOO; K. S. KANG; Y. CHEN; K. J. HAN; J. KIM, "The Ti0 nanoparticle effect on the performance of a conducting polymer Schottky diode", Nanotechnology, (20080000), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1088/0957-4484/19/50/505202, page 505202, XP020144962 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-4484/19/50/505202 | - N. SAKAI; G. K. PRASAD; Y. EBINA; K. TAKADA; T. SASAK, "Layer-by-Layer Assembled Ti0 Nanoparticle/PEDOT-PSS Composite Films for Switching of Electric Conductivity in Response to Ultraviolet and Visible Light", Chem. Mater., (20060000), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1021/cm060696g, pages 3596 - 98, XP002719706 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm060696g | - W. KERN; D. PUOTINEN, RCA Rev., (19700000), vol. 31, page 187 | ES20140000759 |