EP3484560 - RESPIRATION-CONTROLLED APPLICATION OF AEROSOL IN POWDER FORM DURING THE ARTIFICIAL RESPIRATION OR SUPPORTED RESPIRATION OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states MTF MediTech Franken GmbH Forther Hauptstraße 65 90542 Eckental / DE | [2021/18] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Meditech Franken GmbH Forther Hauptstraße 65 90542 Eckental / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHLMANN, Gerhard Am Gallweg 14 31715 Meerbeck / DE | 02 /
WIEGANDT, Felix Carl Bentheimer Straße 34 30529 Hannover / DE | 03 /
IWATSCHENKO, Peter Forther Hauptstraße 65 90542 Eckenthal / DE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2019/21] | Application number, filing date | 17732925.7 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017EP65878 | Priority number, date | DE201610112822 | 13.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016112822 | [2019/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018010954 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3484560 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3484560 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, A61M11/02, A61M15/00, A61M16/00, A61M16/14, A61M16/20 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
A61M11/02 (EP,US);
A61M11/00 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (EP,US);
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M16/0057 (EP,US);
A61M16/1065 (EP,US);
A61M16/14 (EP,US);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M16/206 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0018 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0027 (EP,US);
A61M2202/064 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ATEMGESTEUERTE APPLIKATION VON PULVERFÖRMIGEM AEROSOL BEI DER BEATMUNG ODER ATEMUNTERSTÜTZUNG EINES PATIENTEN | [2019/21] | English: | RESPIRATION-CONTROLLED APPLICATION OF AEROSOL IN POWDER FORM DURING THE ARTIFICIAL RESPIRATION OR SUPPORTED RESPIRATION OF A PATIENT | [2019/21] | French: | SYSTÈME D'APPLICATION, À COMMANDE PAR RESPIRATION, D'AÉROSOL EN POUDRE PENDANT LA RESPIRATION ARTIFICIELLE OU L'ASSISTANCE RESPIRATOIRE D'UN PATIENT | [2019/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 19.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2017 | AL | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | MK | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | RS | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | TR | 05.05.2021 | IE | 27.06.2021 | LU | 27.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 27.06.2017 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
MK | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 27.06.2017 | |
AL | 05.05.2021 | ||
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CY | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
IE | 27.06.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
LU | 27.06.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 05.05.2021 | |
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
RS | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 05.05.2021 | |
LT | 05.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2005048982 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,13 * figure 1 und 3A * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 16 * [A] 9; | [YA]US2005229926 (FINK JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,13 * figure 3 * * paragraph [0051] * [A] 9; | [A]WO2006108558 (ALTANA PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9,13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009042187 (NEKTAR THERAPEUTICS [US], et al) [A] 1-9,13 * the whole document *; | [IAY]DE102008050218 (ACTIVAERO GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-7,13 * figure 1 und 3 * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] * [A] 9 [Y] 8; | [YD]WO2010122103 (NYCOMED GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 8 * page 5, line 7 - line 15 *; | [A]WO2011004275 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9,13* the whole document * | by applicant | WO2010122103 | - ARZU ARI, Aerosol Therapy for Ventilator-Dependent Patients: Devices, Issues, Selection & Technique, Clinical Foundations, pages 7 - 12 | - WALSH,B.K. et al., Perinatal and pediatric respiratory care evolve learning system | - PHILIP CHI LIP KWOK; HAK-KIM CHAN, "Delivery of inhalation drugs to children for asthma and other respiratory diseases", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (20140000), vol. 73, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2013.11.007, pages 83 - 88, XP028855082 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2013.11.007 |