EP3615790 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TIDAL ENERGY CONVERSION AND ELECTRICAL POWER GENERATION USING A ROTATABLE DRAG PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Big Moon Power, Inc. 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | For all designated states Blodgett, Jeff 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | For all designated states Bagley, Colin 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | For all designated states Blodgett, Lynn 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | [2020/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLODGETT, Jeff 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | 02 /
BAGLEY, Colin 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | 03 /
BLODGETT, Lynn 625 W. 3900 S. Suite D2 Salt Lake City, UT 84123 / US | [2020/10] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2020/10] | Application number, filing date | 17733181.6 | 28.04.2017 | [2020/10] | WO2017US30272 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018200005 | Date: | 01.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3615790 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/26 | [2020/10] | CPC: |
F03B13/264 (EP);
F05B2240/931 (EP);
F05B2250/12 (EP);
F05B2250/411 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEZEITENENERGIEUMWANDLUNG UND ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER DREHBAREN SCHLEPPPLATTE | [2020/10] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR TIDAL ENERGY CONVERSION AND ELECTRICAL POWER GENERATION USING A ROTATABLE DRAG PANEL | [2020/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE MARÉMOTRICE ET DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ÉLECTRIQUE À L'AIDE D'UN PANNEAU DE TRAÎNÉE ROTATIF | [2020/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/10] | 08.10.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010140946 (ZHENG XINGYU [CN]) [X] 1,5-20 * paragraphs [0039] - [0045] - [0050] , [0061] - [0062]; figure - * [I] 2-4; | [ID]US2016319798 (BLODGETT LYNN [US], et al) [ID] 1-20 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figures 5A-23B * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0210] *; | [A]GB2424674 (SLOCOMBE CLIVE [GB]) [A] 1-20 * page 1 - page 4; figure - *; | [A]CN102261305 ((SHAO-N) SHAOXING) [A] 1-20 * figure - *; | [A]WO2016186498 (SEACURRENT HOLDING B V [NL]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | by applicant | US5426332 | US5872406 | US2013134714 | US4288985 |