EP3481295 - TREATMENT BED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capical GmbH Rebenring 33 38106 Braunschweig / DE | For all designated states Likamed GmbH Raußmühlstraße 7 75031 Eppingen / DE | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖGE, Henning Pestalozzistrasse 20 38114 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
OEHLER, Martin Im Gettelhagen 102 Niedersachsen 38108 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
FRANK, Yvonne Hengst 9 75050 Gemmingen / DE | 04 /
GAUPP, Bernhard Wilhelm-Frank-Straße 6 75031 Eppingen / DE | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17734050.2 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP65856 | Priority number, date | DE201610112391 | 06.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016112391 | [2019/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018007206 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481295 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0408, A61B5/00, A61B5/0428, A61B5/0424 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/6891 (EP,US);
A61B5/02405 (US);
A61B5/276 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61B5/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/302 (EP,US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
A61B5/7221 (EP,US);
A61B5/746 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSLIEGE | [2019/20] | English: | TREATMENT BED | [2019/20] | French: | LIT DE SOINS | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 24.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005253712 (KIMURA HIROAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0017] , [0058] ** figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2006220350 (REEF RICK R [US], et al) [Y] 5-8 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0026] , [0030] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010007413 (HERLEIKSON EARL C [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 31]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP2316340 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0039] , [0 38] , [0 45] *; | [XY]WO2015075692 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,9-13 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0021] , [0023] , [0027] - [0029] - [0032] , [0042] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-8; | [X] - TOBIAS WARTZEK ET AL, "Automatic electrode selection in unobtrusive capacitive ECG measurements", COMPUTER-BASED MEDICAL SYSTEMS (CBMS), 2012 25TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20120620), doi:10.1109/CBMS.2012.6266314, ISBN 978-1-4673-2049-8, pages 1 - 4, XP032226944 [X] 1,9,13 * Seite 2, linke Spalte, letzte 11 Zeilen * * Seite 2, rechte Spalte, letzte 3 Zeilen * * figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CBMS.2012.6266314 | [X] - SERTEYN A ET AL, "Motion Artifacts in Capacitive ECG Measurements: Reducing the Combined Effect of DC Voltages and Capacitance Changes Using an Injection Signal", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 62, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TBME.2014.2348178, ISSN 0018-9294, (20150101), pages 264 - 273, (20141218), XP011568272 [X] 1 * Seite 265, rechte Spalte, Kapitel III * * Seite 272, rechte Spalte, dritter Absatz * * figures 1-3, 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2014.2348178 |