EP3481215 - FOOD GRADE NATIVE RAPESEED PROTEIN ISOLATE AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLEMSEN, Johannes Hendrikus Maria P.O. Box 4 6100 AA ECHT / NL | 02 /
SMOLDERS, Gerardus Johannes Franciscus P.O. Box 4 6100 AA ECHT / NL | 03 /
ZAMOLO, Richard P.O. Box 4 6100AA ECHT / NL | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/20] | DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 17734755.6 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP66870 | Priority number, date | EP20160178347 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16178347 | EP20170166994 | 19.04.2017 Original published format: EP 17166994 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018007491 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481215 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/14, A23J3/14, A23L11/30, A23L33/185 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
A23L33/185 (EP);
A23J1/14 (EP);
A23K20/147 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Title | German: | RAPSPROTEINISOLAT IN LEBENSMITTELQUALITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2019/20] | English: | FOOD GRADE NATIVE RAPESEED PROTEIN ISOLATE AND PROCESS FOR OBTAINING IT | [2019/20] | French: | ISOLAT DE PROTÉINES DE COLZA NATIVES DE QUALITÉ ALIMENTAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'OBTENIR | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 10.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004039174 (BARKER LARRY D [CA], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0002]; example 4 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2010041871 (SEGALL KEVIN I [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] *; | [XI]EP2736351 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0042] * [I] 2-6,8-12,14; | [A]DE102014005466 (DÜRING KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [XI]US2016031950 (JARAMILLO FREYDELL GABRIEL ESTEBAN [NL], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * * examples 1-2; claims 1-14 * [I] 2-6,8-12,14; | [T] - S. Karimzadeh ET AL, "Effects of Canola Bioactive Peptides on Performance, Digestive Enzyme Activities, Nutrient Digestibility, Intestinal Morphology and Gut Microflora in Broiler Chickens", Poult. Sci. J. All Rights Reserved Poultry Science Journal ISSN Iran Poultry Science Journal, (20160401), pages 27 - 36, URL: http://psj.gau.ac.ir/article_2969_853a7960f9c8ea608396b7975ea061e1.pdf, (20161123), XP055322209 [T] 1-6 * abstract * | [T] - YACHUAN ZHANG ET AL, "Processing and Characteristics of Canola Protein-based Biodegradable Packaging: A Review", CRITICAL REVIEWS IN FOOD SCIENCE AND NUTRITION, USA, (20160705), doi:10.1080/10408398.2016.1193463, ISSN 1040-8398, pages 00 - 00, XP055322193 [T] 1-6 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10408398.2016.1193463 | by applicant | WO2008094434 | US2010041871 | EP1389921 | WO2011057408 | WO2014018922 | WO2014147068 | EP1715752 | WO2015114543 | DE102014005466 | - ROSENTHAL et al., Enzyme and Microbial Technology, (19960000), vol. 19, pages 402 - 420 | - ROSENTHAL et al., Trans iChemE, Part C, (19980000), vol. 76, pages 224 - 230 | - LAWHON et al., J. Food Sci., (19810000), vol. 46, pages 912 - 916 | - MORR et al., J. Food Sci., (19850000), vol. 50, pages 1715 - 1718 | - ELLIS et al., Anal. Biochem., (19770000), vol. 77, pages 536 - 539 |