EP3482490 - VARIABLE SPEED TRANSMISSION WITH AUXILIARY DRIVER AND SYSTEM USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone Tecnologie - S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2022/17] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states NUOVO PIGNONE TECNOLOGIE SRL Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADLEY, Paul John Station Road Atlas Works Pershore Worcestershire WR10 2BZ / GB | 02 /
BOCCADAMO, Gianluca Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | 03 /
MILANI, Giuliano Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / Geneva / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2022/22] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex/ Geneva / CH | ||
Former [2019/20] | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17734776.2 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP67039 | Priority number, date | IT20160071644 | 08.07.2016 Original published format: IT201600071644 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2018007567 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3482490 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3482490 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H02P5/747, F16H3/72 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
F16H3/724 (EP,KR);
F16H3/725 (US);
F02C7/36 (US);
F04D25/028 (EP);
F04D25/163 (KR);
F04D27/004 (KR);
F04D27/0261 (EP);
F25J1/0282 (EP,KR);
F25J1/0284 (EP,KR);
F25J1/0285 (EP,KR);
F25J1/0287 (EP,KR);
F25J1/0288 (EP,KR);
F05D2260/40311 (EP,KR);
F16H2057/02039 (US);
F25J2230/20 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STUFENLOSES GETRIEBE MIT HILFSANTRIEB UND SYSTEM DAMIT | [2019/20] | English: | VARIABLE SPEED TRANSMISSION WITH AUXILIARY DRIVER AND SYSTEM USING SAME | [2019/20] | French: | TRANSMISSION À VITESSE VARIABLE AVEC DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT AUXILIAIRE ET SYSTÈME L'UTILISANT | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 08.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2017 | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CY | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | MK | 01.06.2022 | MT | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SI | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | TR | 01.06.2022 | IE | 06.07.2022 | LU | 06.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
TR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.07.2017 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
IE | 06.07.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SI | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
LU | 06.07.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | HR | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | HR | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | LT | 01.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2908189 (PARKER WILTON E, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, lines 41-54; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 33-53, 69-71 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 11 * * column 7, lines 28-32 * [I] 12; | [A]DE102010014588 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *; | [I]US2010329903 (FONG DANIELLE A [US], et al) [I] 13 * paragraphs [0853] - [0857] - [0979] , [0985] , [1708] , [1713] - [1714]; figures 33,33A,33AA,40,40A,40B *; | [A]US2015292349 (MARIOTTI GABRIELE [IT], et al) [A] 13* paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figure 3 * | Examination | WO2014053421 |