EP3576498 - LED CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR LED CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shindengen Electric Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2019/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASAKA, Toshihiko c/o Factory of SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-8585 / JP | 02 /
IKEDA, Katsuya c/o Factory of SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-8585 / JP | 03 /
TAKASAKA, Seiichi c/o Factory of SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-8585 / JP | 04 /
IIJIMA, Shinya c/o Factory of SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-8585 / JP | 05 /
ITO, Ryuichi c/o Factory of SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-13 Minami-cho Hanno-shi, Saitama 357-8585 / JP | [2019/49] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2019/49] | Application number, filing date | 17735368.7 | 30.01.2017 | [2019/49] | WO2017JP03098 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018138897 | Date: | 02.08.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3576498 | Date: | 04.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3576498 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/14, H05B45/10, H05B45/375, // H05B33/08, H02M1/38, H02M3/28, H02M3/158, H02J1/10 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
H05B45/375 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05B45/325 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05B45/14 (CN);
H01M10/0431 (KR,US);
H05B45/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H05B45/50 (KR);
H05B45/305 (EP,CN,US);
Y02B20/30 (EP,KR);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | H02M1/14, // H05B33/08, H02M1/38, H02M3/28, H02M3/158, H02J1/10 | ||
Former IPC [2019/49] | H05B37/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE LED-STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/49] | English: | LED CONTROL DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD FOR LED CONTROL DEVICE | [2019/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE DEL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE DEL | [2019/49] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2017 | Translation filed | 14.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2019/49] | 19.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2017 | AL | 07.10.2020 | AT | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | IT | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | TR | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | GB | 30.01.2021 | IE | 30.01.2021 | LU | 30.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | FR | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.01.2017 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MK | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.01.2017 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
IE | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
GB | 30.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
FR | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
AT | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
LU | 30.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015327340 (SIESSEGGER BERNHARD [US], et al) [A] 1,15 * figures 4, 12 ** paragraphs [0002] , [0 15] *; | [A]DE102016205796 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1, 4 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0 34] , [0 35] , [0 37] , [0 58] * | International search | [A]JP2011249145 (NEW JAPAN RADIO CO LTD) [A] 1-15* , paragraphs [0018] to [0019]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015041588 (RICOH ELECTRONIC DEVICES CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0028]; fig. 1 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2015041588 |