EP3490831 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VARIABLE-SPEED, COAXIAL PLANETARY GEAR SET TRANSMISSION DEVICE OF A POWERTRAIN, IN PARTICULAR FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4 Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2019/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENTURI, Stephane 0000 RUE LINAS 07100 ROIFFIEUX / FR | [2019/23] | Application number, filing date | 17735588.0 | 10.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017EP67301 | Priority number, date | FR20160057341 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: FR 1657341 | [2019/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018019557 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3490831 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/365, B60K6/383, B60K6/387, B60K6/48, F16H3/72, F16H3/66, F16H3/44 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60K6/365 (EP);
B60K6/383 (EP);
B60K6/387 (EP);
F16H3/66 (EP);
B60K2006/4816 (EP);
F16H2003/445 (EP);
F16H2200/2007 (EP);
F16H2200/2069 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES DREHZAHLVARIABLEN KOAXIALEN PLANETENGETRIEBES EINES ANTRIEBSSTRANGS, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2019/23] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VARIABLE-SPEED, COAXIAL PLANETARY GEAR SET TRANSMISSION DEVICE OF A POWERTRAIN, IN PARTICULAR FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE | [2019/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION A VARIATION DE VITESSE A TRAINS EPICYCLOÏDAUX COAXIAUX D'UN GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULE HYBRIDE | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 28.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/12] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]FR3020786 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]DE102014218610 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0046] , [0055] , [0 56]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [Y]FR3013273 (IFP ENERGIES NOUVELLES [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * page 8, lines 5-13; figure 1 * | by applicant | FR2955165 | FR2962697 |