EP3532150 - NERVE CUFF ELECTRODES FABRICATED USING OVER-MOLDED LCP SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research 25134 Rye Canyon Loop, Suite 200 Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2019/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Siegmar 1532 Violet Lane Simi Valley, California 93065 / US | 02 /
NG, Boon Khai 3653 5th Avenue La Crescenta, California 91214 / US | 03 /
DEARDEN, Brian R. 865 Victoria Drive Pasadena, California 91104 / US | 04 /
HANSEN, Morten 7 School Lane Welwyn, AL6 9ED Hertfordshire / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2019/36] | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Siegmar 1532 Violet Lane Simi Valley, California 93065 / US | ||
02 /
NG, Boon Khai 3653 5th Avenue La Crescenta, California 91214 / US | |||
03 /
DEARDEN, Brian R. 865 Victoria Drive Pasadena, California 91104 / US | |||
04 /
HANSEN, Morten 20 Bluebells Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 0XD / GB | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2019/36] | Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17735755.5 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/36] | WO2017US39424 | Priority number, date | US201662415028P | 31.10.2016 Original published format: US 201662415028 P | [2019/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018080600 | Date: | 03.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3532150 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3532150 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/389, A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61N1/375 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
A61N1/0556 (EP,US);
A61N1/3752 (US);
A61B5/389 (EP,US);
A61N1/0558 (EP,US);
A61N1/3605 (EP,US);
A61N1/375 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/36] | A61N1/05, A61N1/36, A61N1/375, A61B5/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITHILFE VON UMSPRITZTEN LCP-SUBSTRATEN HERGESTELLTE NERVENMANSCHETTENELEKTRODEN | [2019/36] | English: | NERVE CUFF ELECTRODES FABRICATED USING OVER-MOLDED LCP SUBSTRATES | [2019/36] | French: | ÉLECTRODES NERVEUSES À MANCHON FABRIQUÉES À L'AIDE DE SUBSTRATS LCP SURMOULÉS | [2019/36] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2019 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2019 | Examination requested [2019/36] | 31.05.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 01.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Request for further processing for: | 01.05.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 01.05.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.05.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5251634 (WEINBERG STEVEN L [US]) [X] 139-143,145,147,150-152 * columns 2-4; figures 1-5 * [I] 144,146,148,149,153,154; | [XA]US2006030919 (MRVA JOSEPH J [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *[A] 2-13; | [A]WO2009045772 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [A] 181-199 * page 7; figure 4E *; | [A]US7794256 (SOCHOR JERZY ROMAN [US]) [A] 225-239 * abstract *; | [X]WO2012154256 (ADVANCED BIONICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0003] - [0027] - [0072] - [0097]; figures 3-6B,9-10G,11B *; | [A]US2014058482 (GUPTA GAURAV [US], et al) [A] 181-199,225-239 * figures 2,3C, 13,14 *; | [A]US2014163659 (BOLING C LANCE [US]) [A] 155-180 * paragraph [0269]; figures 43,44 * |