EP3474946 - DELIVERY SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICES, AND ASSOCIATED TETHERING ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/18] | DELIVERY SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICES, AND ASSOCIATED TETHERING ASSEMBLIES AND METHODS | ||
[2019/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2019/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADDEN, Jeffrey 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 02 /
KELLY, Tomas K. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 03 /
FRANCIS, Gwenda 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 04 /
MCEVOY, Francis Denis 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 05 /
O'CONNELL, Barry Willow Lodge Cregaclare Demesne Ardrahan, Galway / IE | 06 /
GALLAGHER, John 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 07 /
GERAGHTY, Brendan Patrick 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | 08 /
WOOD, Rónán 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/18] | 01 /
MADDEN, Jeffrey 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | ||
02 /
KELLY, Tomas K. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | |||
03 /
FRANCIS, Gwenda 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | |||
04 /
MCEVOY, Francis Denis 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | |||
05 /
O'CONNELL, Barry 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | |||
06 /
GALLAGHER, John 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | |||
07 /
GERAGHTY, Brendan Patrick 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | |||
08 /
WOOD, Rónán 710 Medtronic Parkway NE. Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432 / US | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/18] | Application number, filing date | 17735760.5 | 27.06.2017 | [2019/18] | WO2017US39583 | Priority number, date | US201615193577 | 27.06.2016 Original published format: US201615193577 | [2019/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005549 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3474946 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3474946 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/375, A61N1/372, A61B17/34 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61N1/3756 (EP,US);
A61N1/362 (US);
A61B17/3468 (US);
A61N1/37205 (EP,US);
A61N1/37518 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREISETZUNGSSYSTEME FÜR IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE FIXIERUNGSANORDNUNGEN | [2019/46] | English: | DELIVERY SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICES, AND ASSOCIATED TETHERING ASSEMBLIES | [2019/46] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DES DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX IMPLANTABLES, ET ENSEMBLES D'ATTACHE | [2019/46] |
Former [2019/18] | FREISETZUNGSSYSTEME FÜR IMPLANTIERBARE MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE FIXIERUNGSANORDNUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2019/18] | DELIVERY SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICES, AND ASSOCIATED TETHERING ASSEMBLIES AND METHODS | ||
Former [2019/18] | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION DES DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX IMPLANTABLES, ET ENSEMBLES D'ATTACHE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/18] | 11.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2017 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | IE | 27.06.2020 | LU | 27.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.06.2017 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.06.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.06.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 27.06.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 27.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015051611 (SCHMIDT BRIAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** paragraphs [0041] - [0047] *; | [AD]US2015094668 (WOOD RÓNÁN [IE], et al) [AD] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0031] - [0 36] - [0039] *; | [A]US2016015983 (SHELDON TODD J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0 28] - [0029] *; | [A]US2016015968 (BONNER MATTHEW D [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0038] *; | [A]US2016067446 (KLENK ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0044] - [0064] * | by applicant | US2015094668 |