EP3471839 - TOGGLE AND ASSEMBLY OF TOGGLE AND SUPPORT MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kee Safety Limited Cradley Business Park Overend Road Cradley Heath, West Midlands B64 7DW / GB | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLMOTT, Graham Mott House Southfields Road Woldingham Surrey CR3 7BQ / GB | [2019/17] | Representative(s) | Badger, John Raymond J.R. Badger & Co. 6 Simpson Road Wylde Green Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B72 1EP / GB | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17736698.6 | 14.06.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017GB00091 | Priority number, date | GB20160010570 | 17.06.2016 Original published format: GB 201610570 | GB20160013161 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: GB 201613161 | [2019/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017216509 | Date: | 21.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3471839 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
F16B13/0808 (EP,US);
A62B35/0068 (EP,GB,US);
E04G21/328 (GB,US);
E04G21/3295 (US);
F16B2/02 (US);
F16B9/00 (GB);
F24S25/61 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | KIPPSCHALTER UND ANORDNUNG AUS UMSCHALT- UND STÜTZELEMENT | [2019/17] | English: | TOGGLE AND ASSEMBLY OF TOGGLE AND SUPPORT MEMBER | [2019/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FIXATION ET ENSEMBLE CONSTITUÉ DU SYSTÈME DE FIXATION ET D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE SUPPORT | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 07.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1152070 (GKN SCREWS FASTENERS LTD); | [Y]US5197567 (RABALAIS KEITH J [US]); | [A]DE202006016678U (ABS SAFETY GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP2687267 (CAPITAL ACCESS SARL [LU]) |