EP3646494 - FEEDBACK SIGNALING FORMAT SELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2020/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDEMAIR, Robert Honnörsgatan 16 SE-17069 Solna / SE | 02 /
PARKVALL, Stefan Hermelinstigen 24 SE-167 57 Bromma / SE | 03 /
CHENG, Jung-Fu 1806 Mandan Place Fremont, California 94539 / US | [2020/19] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2020/19] | Application number, filing date | 17737071.5 | 27.06.2017 | [2020/19] | WO2017SE50710 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019004881 | Date: | 03.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3646494 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04L5/00 | [2020/19] | CPC: |
H04L1/0013 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/001 (US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,KR);
H04L1/0073 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1607 (US);
H04L1/1664 (EP,KR);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] | Title | German: | RÜCKKOPPLUNGSSIGNALISIERUNGSFORMATAUSWAHL | [2020/19] | English: | FEEDBACK SIGNALING FORMAT SELECTION | [2020/19] | French: | SÉLECTION DE FORMAT DE SIGNALISATION DE RÉTROACTION | [2020/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/19] | 20.01.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP2536050 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-4,6,7,11,13-15 * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0145] - paragraph [0177] * * figures 10-16 * [Y] 5,12 [I] 8-10; | [YA] - ERICSSON, "On UCI on PUSCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170617), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1711495, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/NR_AH_1706/Docs/, (20170617), XP051305623 [Y] 5 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6-15 | [YA] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "UCI on PUSCH", vol. RAN WG1, no. Qingdao, P.R. China; 20170627 - 20170630, (20170626), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1711104, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170626), XP051300304 [Y] 12 * the whole document * [A] 1-11,13-15 |