EP3478463 - RAZOR BLADE WITH A PRINTED OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company LLC One Gillette Park Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICHOLAS, Andrew, Charles One Gillette Park Boston, Massachusetts 02127 / US | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 17737182.0 | 28.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017US39611 | Priority number, date | US201615197504 | 29.06.2016 Original published format: US201615197504 | [2019/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018005570 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3478463 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/60 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
B26B21/443 (EP,US);
B26B21/4012 (EP,US);
B26B21/4068 (EP,US);
B26B21/60 (EP,US);
B41J3/413 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | RASIERKLINGE MIT EINEM GEDRUCKTEN OBJEKT | [2019/19] | English: | RAZOR BLADE WITH A PRINTED OBJECT | [2019/19] | French: | LAME DE RASOIR AVEC UN OBJET IMPRIMÉ | [2019/19] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 14.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4211006 (CACO EDWARD S [US], et al); | [A]JP2004337540 (SHUHO KK); | [X]US2007062047 (ZHUK ANDREW [US], et al) | by applicant | US5263256 | US5645894 | US7024776 | US2008034590 | US2009049695 | US7607230 |