EP3371768 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND HARDWARE DIAGNOSIS RESULT-BASED PROCESS EXECUTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANG, Minsuk No. 506-508, 111, Byeoryang-ro Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13836 / KR | 02 /
KOO, Gyoseung 49, Witbaeraengi-gil Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 13827 / KR | 03 /
NA, Seokhee No. 206-701, 32, Convensia-daero 130beon-gil Yeonsu-gu Incheon 22003 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Kyuok No. 103-1901, 100-8, Ichon-ro Yongsan-gu Seoul 04381 / KR | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 17738706.5 | 16.01.2017 | [2018/37] | WO2017KR00538 | Priority number, date | KR20160005637 | 15.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160005637 | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123077 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371768 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00, H04W4/00, G06Q10/02, H04M1/725, G06F9/44, G06K9/00, A61B5/22, A61B5/021, G06F3/0488, G01D18/00, G06F11/22, G06F3/0354, G06F3/041, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0482, G06Q10/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
A61B5/02055 (US);
A61B5/1172 (US);
G01D18/00 (US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0276 (EP,US);
A61B5/021 (US);
A61B5/024 (US);
G06F11/2221 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (US);
G06F3/0418 (US);
G06F3/04186 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | G06Q50/00, H04W4/00, G06Q10/02, H04M1/725, G06F9/44, G06K9/00, A61B5/22, A61B5/021, G06F3/0488 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG EINES HARDWARE-DIAGNOSEERGEBNISBASIERTEN VERFAHRENS | [2018/37] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND HARDWARE DIAGNOSIS RESULT-BASED PROCESS EXECUTION METHOD THEREOF | [2018/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ D'EXÉCUTION D'UN PROCESSUS BASÉ SUR LE RÉSULTAT DE DIAGNOSTIC D'UN MATÉRIEL | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2018 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 07.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 03.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2003124866 (NEC COMMUNICATION SYST) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0011] - [0022]; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]KR20130064859 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,7-9,12-14 * page 5 - page 16; figures 1-12 * [I] 2-6,10,11,15 | International search | [XY]US7209737 (CHO BYOUNG KUAN [KR]) [X] 1-2, 4, 7, 10, 14 * See column 4, lines 30-61, column 6, lines 19-34, claims 1, 24 and figure 5. * [Y] 3, 5-6, 8-9, 11-13, 15; | [Y]US2009150819 (CHEONG JUN [KR], et al) [Y] 9, 11-13 * See paragraph [0079], claim 8 and figure 5. *; | [A]US2009164849 (SUGAYA SHUNJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1, 3-5 and figures 4-5, 8. *; | [A]US7886189 (MORI KENSAKU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-4, 6 and figures 3-4, 7-8. *; | [Y]US2014066015 (AISSI SELIM [US]) [Y] 3, 5-6, 8, 15 * See paragraph [0133] and claims 1-2, 9. * |