EP3403098 - DIAGNOSTICS USING CONDITIONALLY ACTIVE ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioAtla, Inc. 11085 Torreyana Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2021/33] |
Former [2018/47] | For all designated states Bioatla, LLC 11085 Torreyana Road, Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHORT, Jay M. 12985 Via Esperia Del Mar California 92014 / US | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17738795.8 | 10.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017US12830 | Priority number, date | US201662277750P | 12.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662277750 P | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123537 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403098 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3403098 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, G01N33/543, G01N33/536 | [2018/47] | CPC: |
G01N33/574 (EP);
G01N33/57492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTIKA MIT BEDINGT AKTIVEN ANTIKÖRPERN | [2018/47] | English: | DIAGNOSTICS USING CONDITIONALLY ACTIVE ANTIBODIES | [2018/47] | French: | DIAGNOSTICS À L'AIDE D'ANTICORPS CONDITIONNELLEMENT ACTIFS | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 30.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 20.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2017 | AL | 22.09.2021 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | ES | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | HR | 22.09.2021 | IT | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MK | 22.09.2021 | MT | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | RS | 22.09.2021 | SE | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | SM | 22.09.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | NO | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 10.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 10.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 10.01.2017 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 22.09.2021 | |
NO | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013134743 (HALOZYME INC [US]) [A] 1-17* page 238 *; | [E]WO2017078839 (BIOATLA LLC [US]) [E] 1,9,10,13 * paragraph [0414] *; | [E]WO2018044619 (BIOATLA LLC [US]) [E] 1,9,10,13 * paragraph [0484] * | International search | [A]US2013052648 (YARMUSH MARTIN L [US], et al) [A] 1-12, 15-16, 18-30 , 36* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2013266579 (WEI GE [US], et al) [A] 1-12, 15-16, 18-30 , 36 * See the whole document. *; | [Y]US2014127290 (HE XIAOMING [US], et al) [Y] 2-11 * See claims 1 and 3-4; paragraphs [0007], [0036]-[0038], [0047] and [0060]. *; | [Y]WO2015092726 (UNIVERSIT DEGLI STUDI DI UDINE [IT], et al) [Y] 1-12, 15-16, 18-30 , 36 * See claim 1; page 1, lines 19-23. *; | [A]WO2015095603 (AXON DX LLC [US]) [A] 1-12, 15-16, 18-30 , 36 * See the whole document. *; | [Y]WO2015175375 (SHORT JAY M [US], et al) [Y] 1-12, 15-16, 18-30 , 36 * See claims 1-2, 12, 31-34, 72-74 and 78; paragraphs [0175]-[0176], [0186]-[0187], [0204]-[0206] and [0334]. * | by applicant | US4353888 | US4391909 | US4689293 | US4803168 | US4806355 | US5227298 | US5573934 | US2002004587 | US2002098559 | US2004029241 | US2004086493 | US2004170612 | US6790455 | US6818230 | US2005037029 | US2005118425 | US2005202096 | US2005214377 | US7041504 | US2006251630 | US7297331 | US2009130718 | US2009214660 | US2009269313 | WO2010104821 | US2011064797 | US8039218 | US2012094275 | US8202701 | US2012164127 | US2012213708 | US2012231443 | US2012308650 | US8445225 | US2013277872 | WO2013170168 | US2014127290 | WO2014126904 | US2014271843 | - BUTLERGULLINO, Cancer Res., (19750000), vol. 35, pages 512 - 516 | - GILLIES et al., "MRI of the Tumor Microenvironment", Journal of Magnetic Resonance Imaging, (20020000), vol. 16, doi:10.1002/jmri.10181, pages 430 - 450, XP055045243 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmri.10181 | - SAKADZIC et al., "Two-photon high-resolution measurement of partial pressure of oxygen in cerebral vasculature and tissue", Nature Methods, (20100000), vol. 7, pages 755 - 759 | - SWARTS et al., "Tumor Microenvironment Complexity: Emerging Roles in Cancer Therapy", Cancer Res, (20120000), vol. 72, pages 2473 - 2480 | - ESTRELLA et al., "Acidity Generated by the Tumor Microenvironment Drives Local Invasion", Cancer Res., (20130000), vol. 73, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-2796, pages 1524 - 1535, XP055620422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-2796 | - LORUSSO et al., "The tumor microenvironment and its contribution to tumor evolution toward metastasis", Histochem Cell Biol, (20080000), vol. 130, doi:10.1007/s00418-008-0530-8, pages 1091 - 1103, XP019657787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00418-008-0530-8 | - GILLIES et al., "MRI of the Tumor Microenvironment", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, (20020000), vol. 16, doi:10.1002/jmri.10181, pages 430 - 450, XP055045243 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jmri.10181 | - MAYERS et al., "Elevated circulating branched chain amino acids are an early event in pancreatic adenocarcinoma development", Nature Medicine, (20140000), vol. 20, pages 1193 - 1198 | - WEBER et al., "The tumor microenvironment", Surgical Oncology, (20120000), vol. 21, pages 172 - 177 | - BLAGOSKLONNY, "Antiangiogenic therapy and tumor progression", Cancer Cell, (20040000), vol. 5, pages 13 - 17 | - ESTRELLA et al., "Acidity Generated by the Tumor Microenvironment Drives Local Invasion", Cancer Research, (20130000), vol. 73, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-2796, pages 1524 - 1535, XP055620422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-2796 | - BENJAMIN et al., "Measurement of soft tissue temperature and impedance following the application of transdermal direct current", Physiotherapy, (20070000), vol. 93, doi:10.1016/j.physio.2006.11.008, pages 114 - 120, XP022053862 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.physio.2006.11.008 | - DUNN-MEYNELL et al., "Relationship among Brain and Blood Glucose Levels and Spontaneous and Glucoprivic Feeding", The Journal of Neuroscience, (20090000), vol. 29, pages 7015 - 7022 | - HUR et al., "Quantitative Measurement of Organic Acids in Tissues from Gastric Cancer Patients Indicates Increased Glucose Metabolism in Gastric Cancer", PLoS ONE, (20140000), vol. 9, page e98581 | - ZATSEPIN et al., Russ. Chem. Rev., (20050000), vol. 74, pages 77 - 95 | - PHILLIPS et al., Wiley Interdisciplinary Reviews: Nanomedicine and Nanobiotechnology, (20080000), vol. 1, pages 69 - 83 | - ELBAYOUMI, T.A.TORCHILIN, V.P., Eur. J. Nucl. Med. Mol. Imaging, (20060000), vol. 33, pages 1196 - 1205 | - MOUGIN-DEGRAEF, M. et al., Int'l J. Pharmaceutics, (20070000), vol. 344, pages 110 - 117 | - TORCHILIN, V.P., Curr. Pharm. Biotech., (20000000), vol. 1, pages 183 - 215 | - BOGDANOV, A.A. et al., Adv. Drug Del. Rev., (19990000), vol. 37, pages 279 - 293 | - SACHSE, A., Investigative Radiology, (19970000), vol. 32, pages 44 - 50 | - VONA et al., "Isolation by size of epithelial tumor cells - A new method for the immunomorphological and molecular characterization of circulating tumor cells", American Journal Of Pathology, (20000000), vol. 156, pages 57 - 63, XP002186868 | - "Complex Coacervation: Microcapsule Formation. In: Dubin", BURGESS, D. J., Macromolecular Complexes in Chemistry and Biology, Springer-Verlag, (19940000), pages 285 - 300 |