EP3403151 - PREDICTIVE FREE COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optimum Energy, LLC 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERPELDING, Ben 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | 02 /
DEMPSTER, Ian 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Peng 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | 04 /
MATTHYS, Clark 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | [2019/14] |
Former [2018/47] | 01 /
ERPELDING, Ben 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle WA 98104 / US | ||
02 /
DEMPSTER, Ian 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
03 /
CHEN, Peng 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle WA 98104 / US | |||
04 /
MATTHYS, Clark 411 First Avenue South Suite 620 Seattle WA 98104 / US | Representative(s) | Carter, Stephen John, et al K2 IP Limited No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2018/47] | Application number, filing date | 17738973.1 | 12.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017US13254 | Priority number, date | US201662277883P | 12.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662277883 P | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017123810 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403151 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B21/00, G05D23/00, G05D23/19, H05K7/20, G05B19/042, F24F11/00, F24F110/10, F24F110/12, F24F140/60, F24F130/10, F24F11/62, F24F11/76, F24F11/30, F24F130/00 | [2019/52] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/65 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/523 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/62 (EP,US);
F24F11/64 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/76 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2011/0002 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2110/12 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2130/00 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2130/10 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2140/60 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/2614 (EP,KR,US);
Y02B30/54 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | G05B21/00, G05D23/00, G05D23/19, G06F19/00, H05K7/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | PRÄDIKTIVE FREIE KÜHLUNG | [2018/47] | English: | PREDICTIVE FREE COOLING | [2018/47] | French: | PRÉDICTION DE REFROIDISSEMENT NATUREL | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 22.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2021 | 31.01.2022 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012232879 (IYENGAR MADHUSUDAN K [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0053] - [0058]; figures 1,6; claim 4 *; | [X]US2013124003 (LEHMAN BRET W [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0010] - [0023] - [0 40]; claims 1,13 *; | [X]US2014277756 (BRUCE BRADLEY STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0035] - [0047] - [ 132] - [0140] *; | [A]US8897921 (DEMPSTER IAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [A]US2015127165 (QUAM DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0103] - [0121] * | International search | [Y]US6202429 (KINKEL STEPHEN W [US], et al) [Y] 8, 17 * entire document *; | [A]US7870090 (MCCOY SEAN M [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2011153524 (SCHNACKEL GREGORY R [US]) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2013124003 (LEHMAN BRET W [US]) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US8543244 (KEELING OLIVER JOE [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2014277759 (SIPE JUSTIN JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [A]WO2014152276 (PACECONTROLS LLC [US]) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014316583 (AMBRIZ ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]US8897921 (DEMPSTER IAN [US], et al) [Y] 3, 7, 12, 16 * entire document *; | [A]WO2015035241 (GREENSLEEVES LLC [US]) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]US2015377509 (NICOLAI MICHAEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A] - PAWLISH et al., "Free cooling: A paradigm shift in data centers", Information and Automation for Sustainability, (20100000), pages 347 - 352, URL: http://www.cs.montclair.edu/~greenit/papers/Sri%20Lanka.pdf, (20170220), XP031979706 [A] 1-18 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIAFS.2010.5715685 |