EP3403187 - SINGLE CLICK DELTA ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumo Logic 305 Main Street 3rd Floor Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2018/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMEL, Matt, K. 305 Main St. 3rd Floor Redwood City CA 94063 / US | 02 /
BEEDGEN, Christian, Friedrich 305 Main St. 3rd Floor Redwood City CA 94063 / US | 03 /
SAURABH, Kumar 305 Main St. 3rd Floor Redwood City CA 94063 / US | 04 /
KURTIC, Bruno 305 Main St. 3rd Floor Redwood City CA 94063 / US | [2018/47] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/47] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17739096.0 | 13.01.2017 | [2018/47] | WO2017US13543 | Priority number, date | US201662278862P | 14.01.2016 Original published format: US 201662278862 P | [2018/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017124024 | Date: | 20.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3403187 | Date: | 21.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/2458, G06F15/16, G06Q10/06, H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
G06F16/2428 (EP,US);
G06F16/245 (US);
G06F16/24568 (EP,US);
G06F16/2462 (EP,US);
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/285 (EP,US);
G06F21/552 (EP,US);
G06F21/566 (EP,US);
H04L43/0817 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/47] | G06F15/16, G06F17/30, G06Q10/06, H04L12/24, H04L12/26, H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/47] | Title | German: | EINZELKLICK-DELTA-ANALYSE | [2018/47] | English: | SINGLE CLICK DELTA ANALYSIS | [2018/47] | French: | ANALYSE DE DELTA EN UN SEUL CLIC | [2018/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/47] | 02.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.01.2024 | 17.01.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/24] | 05.02.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2014040306 (GLUZMAN PEREGRINE VLADIMIR [US], et al); | [A]US8862537 (KURTIC BRUNO [US], et al); | [X]EP2871577 (SOFTWARE AG [DE]) | International search | [A]US6363391 (ROSENSTEEL JR KENNETH R [US]); | [Y]US2003144988 (NAREDDY KRISHNAMOHAN [US], et al); | [XY]US2012066065 (SWITZER NANCY [US]) |