EP3468333 - DISC TOOL, AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT COMPRISING SUCH A DISC TOOL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DISC TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Väderstad Holding AB P.O. Box 167 590 21 Väderstad / SE | [2019/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARK, Crister Lejonbacken 590 21 VÄDERSTAD / SE | 02 /
HAMMARSTRÖM, Urban Mjölbygatan 28 596 33 SKÄNNINGE / SE | 03 /
ESKO, Heino Västerlidsvägen 1 590 96 ÖVERUM / SE | 04 /
SOMLIN, Dan Uddängsvägen 10 593 93 VÄSTERVIK / SE | [2019/16] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [2019/16] | Application number, filing date | 17739717.1 | 02.06.2017 | [2019/16] | WO2017SE50591 | Priority number, date | SE20160050815 | 10.06.2016 Original published format: SE 1650815 | [2019/16] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017213575 | Date: | 14.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3468333 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3468333 | Date: | 15.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01B15/16 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
A01B15/16 (EP,US);
A01B7/00 (SE);
A01B23/06 (SE,US);
A01B21/086 (EP,SE,US);
B23P15/28 (SE);
A01B15/18 (EP,US);
A01B21/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEIBENWERKZEUG, LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES ARBEITSGERÄT MIT SOLCH EINEM SCHEIBENWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SCHEIBENWERKZEUGS | [2019/16] | English: | DISC TOOL, AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT COMPRISING SUCH A DISC TOOL AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A DISC TOOL | [2019/16] | French: | OUTIL À DISQUE, OUTIL AGRICOLE COMPRENANT UN TEL OUTIL À DISQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN OUTIL À DISQUE | [2019/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/16] | 20.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.06.2017 | AL | 15.04.2020 | AT | 15.04.2020 | CY | 15.04.2020 | EE | 15.04.2020 | ES | 15.04.2020 | FI | 15.04.2020 | HR | 15.04.2020 | IT | 15.04.2020 | LT | 15.04.2020 | LV | 15.04.2020 | MC | 15.04.2020 | MK | 15.04.2020 | MT | 15.04.2020 | NL | 15.04.2020 | RO | 15.04.2020 | RS | 15.04.2020 | SE | 15.04.2020 | SI | 15.04.2020 | SK | 15.04.2020 | SM | 15.04.2020 | TR | 15.04.2020 | IE | 02.06.2020 | LU | 02.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | BG | 15.07.2020 | NO | 15.07.2020 | GR | 16.07.2020 | IS | 15.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 02.06.2017 | |
AL | 15.04.2020 | ||
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
CY | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
MT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
TR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.06.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SI | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.06.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
IE | 02.06.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 02.06.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SK | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
AT | 15.04.2020 | ||
EE | 15.04.2020 | ||
ES | 15.04.2020 | ||
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
IT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
MC | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RO | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
SM | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 15.04.2020 | |
FI | 15.04.2020 | ||
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
BG | 15.07.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
RS | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
HR | 15.04.2020 | ||
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
LV | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
GR | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 15.04.2020 | |
LT | 15.04.2020 | ||
NL | 15.04.2020 | ||
SE | 15.04.2020 | ||
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 15.04.2020 | |
NO | 15.07.2020 | ||
IS | 15.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 15.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2646585 (JAVERLHAC JEAN C [FR]) [X] 1-25 * page 5, line 27 - line 29 ** figure 6 *; | [X]US7143838 (PICCAT JULIO CESAR [AR]) [X] 1-25 * figure 3 *; | [X]GB2437481 (DOWDESWELL ENG CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-25 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2945179 (JAVERLHAC JEAN CHARLES [FR]) [X] 1-25 * figure 11 * * page 9, line 23 - line 24 *; | [XD]WO2014137281 (VÄDERSTAD VERKEN AB [SE]) [XD] 1-25 * figures 4,5 * |