EP3478864 - WHITE AU-BASE BULK SOLIDIFYING AMORPHOUS ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/19] | SOLID GLASS-FORMING WHITE GOLD ALLOY | ||
[2020/09] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität des Saarlandes Campus Saarbrücken 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [2019/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSS, Oliver Eimersdorfer Str. 13 66780 Rehlingen-Siersburg / DE | 02 /
GALLINO, Isabella Am Stadtwald 10 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | 03 /
BUSCH, Ralf Am Stadtwald 10 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | 04 /
EISENBART, Miriam Nikolausgasse 7 73525 Schwäbisch-Gmünd / DE | 05 /
KLOTZ, Ulrich Beim Wasserturm 15 73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [2019/19] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2019/19] | Application number, filing date | 17739868.2 | 29.06.2017 | [2019/19] | WO2017EP00777 | Priority number, date | DE20161008074 | 30.06.2016 Original published format: DE102016008074 | [2019/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018001564 | Date: | 04.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3478864 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C22C5/02, C22C45/00 | [2019/19] | CPC: |
C22C5/02 (EP);
C22C45/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/19] | Title | German: | MASSIVGLASBILDENDE WEISSGOLDLEGIERUNG | [2019/19] | English: | WHITE AU-BASE BULK SOLIDIFYING AMORPHOUS ALLOY | [2020/09] | French: | ALLIAGE D'OR BLANC GÉNÉRATEUR DE VERRE MASSIF | [2019/19] |
Former [2019/19] | SOLID GLASS-FORMING WHITE GOLD ALLOY | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/19] | 22.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/23] | 03.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006045106 (LIQUIDMETAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,4,6 *; | [A]WO2015184438 (GLASSIMETAL TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-9,15 *; | [A] - Eisenbart, M, "On the Processing and the Tarnishing Mechanism of Gold-based Bulk Metallic Glasses, Dissertation", (20160523), pages FP - 175, URL: http://scidok.sulb.uni-saarland.de/volltexte/2016/6521/, (20170823), XP002773191 [A] 1-10 * page 67, paragraph 2 - page 68; examples 8,9,26,27; table 4.3 * | [A] - EISENBART, M., KLOTZ, U. E., BUSCH, R. & GALLINO, I., "A colourimetric and microstructural study of the tarnishing of gold-based bulk metallic glasses", CORROSION SCIENCE, (20140424), vol. 85, no. 2014, pages 258 - 269, XP002773192 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.corsci.2014.04.024 | [A] - EISENBART, M, KLOTZ, U, E., BUSCH, R, & GALLINO, I., "On the abnormal room temperature tarnishing of an 18 karat gold bulk metallic glass alloy", JOURNAL OF ALLOYS AND COMPOUNDS, (20141201), vol. 615, no. 2014, pages S118 - S122, XP002773193 [A] 1-10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jallcom.2013.11.167 | by applicant | US8501087 | - S. WANG; T. CHIN, "Tin -modified gold-based bulk metallic glasses", Gold Bull., (20120000), vol. 45, pages 3 - 8 | - C.W. CORTI, "What is a white gold", Progress on the Issues; The Santa Fe Symposium,, (20050000), pages 103 - 120 | - EISENBART, M.; KLOTZ, U. E.; BUSCH, R.; GALLINO, I., "A colourimetric and microstructural study of the tarnishing of gold-based bulk metallic glasses", Corrosion Science,, (20140000), vol. 85, pages 258 - 269, XP002773192 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.corsci.2014.04.024 | - EISENBART, M; KLOTZ, U, E.; BUSCH, R; GALLINO, I., "On the abnormal room tennperature tarnishing of an 18 karat gold bulk metallic glass altoy", Journal of Alloys and Compounds, (20140000), vol. 615, pages S118 - S122, XP002773193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jallcom.2013.11.167 | - HARPER, J.; CHARAI, A.; STOLT, L; D'HEURLE NULL, F.; FRYER, P., "Room Temperature Oxidation of Silicon Catalyzed by Cu$_3$Si", MRS Proceedings, (19900000), vol. 187, pages 2519 - 2521 | - ALFORD, T. L; JAQUEZ, E. J.; THEODORE, N, D.; RUSSELL, S. W.; DIALE, M.; ADAMS, D.; ANDERS, S., "Influence of interfacial copper on the room temperature oxidation of Silicon", Journal of Applied Physics, AIP, (19960000), vol. 79, pages 2074 - 2078 | - GUO, H.; ZHANG, W.; CHEN, M. W.; SAOTOME, Y.; FUKUHARA, M.; INOUE, A., "Effect of Au content on thermal stability and mechanical properties of Au-Cu-Ag-Si bulk metallic glasses.", Metallurgical and Materials Transactions A,, (20110000), vol. 42, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1007/s11661-010-0584-9, pages 1486 - 1490, XP019897876 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11661-010-0584-9 | - WANG, S.; CHIN, T., "Tin -modified gold-based bulk metallic glasses", Gold Bull., (20120000), vol. 45, pages 3 - 8 |