EP3482175 - INFRARED UPCONVERSION SPECTROMETER FOR THE MID-IR RANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 2800 Kongens Lyngby / DK | [2022/14] |
Former [2019/20] | For all designated states Danmarks Tekniske Universitet Anker Engelunds Vej 101 A 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Christian Vigerslev Allé 71 3.tv. 2500 Valby / DK | 02 /
TIDEMAND-LICHTENBERG, Peter Kløvervang 11 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 03 /
DAM, Jeppe, Seidelin Agervang 102 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | 04 /
HØGSTEDT, Lasse Nordre Jernbanevej 15a 1. 3400 Hillerød / DK | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [2019/20] | Application number, filing date | 17739937.5 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017EP67053 | Priority number, date | EP20160178696 | 08.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16178696 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018007572 | Date: | 11.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3482175 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3482175 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/18, G01J3/28 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
G01J3/0245 (EP,US);
G01J3/108 (US);
G01J3/0208 (EP,US);
G01J3/18 (EP,US);
G01J3/2803 (EP,US);
G01J3/2823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFRAROT-AUFWÄRTSUMSETZUNGSSPEKTROMETER FÜR DEN MITTLEREN IR-BEREICH | [2019/20] | English: | INFRARED UPCONVERSION SPECTROMETER FOR THE MID-IR RANGE | [2019/20] | French: | SPECTROMÈTRE DE CONVERSION-ÉLÉVATION INFRAROUGE POUR LA GAMME D'INFRAROUGE MOYEN | [2022/29] |
Former [2019/20] | SPECTROMÈTRE INFRAROUGE DE CONVERSION-ÉLÉVATION POUR LA PLAGE DE L'INFRAROUGE MOYEN | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/20] | 08.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4980566 (HEILWEIL EDWIN J [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 62; figure 1a *; | [A]US2007152154 (DECAMP MATTHEW F [US], et al) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [AD]WO2015003721 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK]) [AD] 1-9* abstract *; | [I] - MATTHEW DECAMP ET AL, "Upconversion multichannel infrared spectrometer", OPTICS LETTERS, (20050715), vol. 30, no. 14, doi:10.1364/OL.30.001818, ISSN 0146-9592, page 1818, XP055091636 [I] 1-9 * page 1818 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.30.001818 | by applicant | US4980566 | WO2015003721 | - JEPPE SEIDELIN DAM et al., "Room-temperature mid-infrared single-photon spectral imaging", Nature Photonics, (20120000), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/nphoton.2012.231, pages 788 - 793, XP055062417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nphoton.2012.231 | - HU et al., Optics Letters, (20120000), vol. 37, no. 24, pages 5232 - 5234 |