EP3308334 - OPTIMIZED DIGITAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANAN, Shibani 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Vinod Kumar 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Christopher K. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
HSIAO, Sissie Ling-le 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael David Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 17740141.1 | 06.06.2017 | [2018/16] | WO2017US36057 | Priority number, date | US201615250247 | 29.08.2016 Original published format: US201615250247 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018044374 | Date: | 08.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308334 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q30/02, G06F17/30 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/101 (EP,US);
G06F16/316 (CN);
G06F16/986 (US);
G06F16/248 (EP,US);
G06F16/338 (CN);
G06F16/438 (EP,US);
G06F16/93 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (CN);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06F40/10 (CN);
G06F40/103 (US);
G06F40/279 (CN);
G06Q30/0242 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTE DIGITALE KOMPONENTEN | [2018/16] | English: | OPTIMIZED DIGITAL COMPONENTS | [2018/16] | French: | COMPOSANTS NUMÉRIQUES OPTIMISÉS | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 11.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.07.2019 | 09.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/48] | 11.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.07.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/48] | Divisional application(s) | EP17193902.8 / EP3312786 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2015026144 (WAI CONRAD [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0044] - [0049]; figure 2A *; | [A]US2016155143 (HSIAO SISSIE LING-LE [US], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0275] - [0291] * |