EP3472104 - DEVICE FOR SEPARATING PRODUCT WATER FROM IMPURE RAW WATER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜTTNER, Andreas Haus Nr. 5A 67822 Stolzenberger Hof / DE | 02 /
HAMMER, Thomas Zeckerner Hauptstrasse 5B 91334 Hemhofen / DE | 03 /
UNGERER, Markus Wellerstädterweg 44 91083 Baiersdorf / DE | [2019/17] | Application number, filing date | 17740344.1 | 06.07.2017 | [2019/17] | WO2017EP66851 | Priority number, date | DE201610214019 | 29.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016214019 | [2019/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018019534 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3472104 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/04, C02F1/10, B01D1/14, B01D5/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
B01D1/14 (US);
B01D3/007 (EP,US);
B01D3/346 (EP,US);
B01D5/003 (US);
B01D5/006 (EP,US);
B01D5/009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTRENNEN VON PRODUKTWASSER AUS VERUNREINIGTEM ROHWASSER UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DIESER VORRICHTUNG | [2019/17] | English: | DEVICE FOR SEPARATING PRODUCT WATER FROM IMPURE RAW WATER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THIS DEVICE | [2019/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION D'EAU PRODUITE PRÉSENTE DANS DE L'EAU BRUTE CONTAMINÉE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER LEDIT DISPOSITIF | [2019/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 15.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE3435614 (LONGERICH BERNHARD DIPL ING FH) [X] 1-5,10,11 * figure . * * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 22 * [I] 6-9,12,13; | [XI]US3833479 (FREDRIKSSON C) [X] 1-6,10,11 * figures 1, 2 * * column 1, line 19 - column 3, line 7 * [I] 7-9,12,13; | [XI]WO2015048878 (INNOCORPS RES CORP [CA]) [X] 1 * figure 3 * * page 11, line 11 - page 12, line 18 * [I] 2-13; | [XI]CN105344119 (ZHEJIANG QICAI ENVIRONMENTAL PROT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY LTD COMPANY) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0050] - [0074] * [I] 2-13; | [XI]JP5555168B (YABE, TAKASHI; NISSO ENGINEERING CO.,LTD) [X] 1,3 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0037] * [I] 2,4-13; | [I]DE102008051731 (TERRAWATER GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-13 * figure . * * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] * | by applicant | DE102014217281 |