EP3485211 - APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR DRYING AND CRUSHING A WATERY POLYMER GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/21] | BELT DRYER ARRANGEMENT FOR DRYING AN AQUEOUS POLYMER GEL AND FOR COMMINUTING THE DRIED POLYMER GEL TO FORM DRIED POLYMER PARTICLES, AND METHOD FOR DRYING AN AQUEOUS POLYMER GEL AND FOR COMMINUTING THE DRIED POLYMER GEL TO FORM DRIED POLYMER PARTICLES | ||
[2021/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/47] |
Former [2019/21] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Andrea Karen Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
MCCORMACK, Paul Walter Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
ELLIOTT, Mark Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/21] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2021/47] |
Former [2019/21] | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17740653.5 | 04.07.2017 | [2019/21] | WO2017EP66633 | Priority number, date | EP20160179778 | 15.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16179778 | [2019/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011018 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3485211 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3485211 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F26B17/04, B01J20/30 | [2019/21] | CPC: |
F26B17/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/291 (EP,US);
B01J20/3021 (EP,KR,US);
B01J20/3078 (EP,KR,US);
B29B13/06 (EP);
B29B13/10 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP);
C08F6/06 (US);
F26B1/005 (KR);
B01J2220/68 (EP,US);
C08F2500/24 (US);
F26B2200/08 (US);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN UND ZUM ZERKLEINERN EINES WÄSSRIGEN POLYMERGELS | [2021/22] | English: | APPARATUS AND PROCESS FOR DRYING AND CRUSHING A WATERY POLYMER GEL | [2021/22] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE SÉCHAGE ET BROYAGE D'UN GEL POLYMÈRE HUMIDE | [2021/22] |
Former [2019/21] | BANDTROCKNERANORDNUNG ZUM TROCKNEN EINES WÄSSRIGEN POLYMERGELS UND ZUM ZERKLEINERN DES GETROCKNETEN POLYMERGELS ZU GETROCKNETEN POLYMERPARTIKELN UND VERFAHREN ZUM TROCKNEN EINES WÄSSRIGEN POLYMERGELS UND ZUM ZERKLEINERN DES GETROCKNETEN POLYMERGELS ZU GETROCKNETEN POLYMERPARTIKELN | ||
Former [2019/21] | BELT DRYER ARRANGEMENT FOR DRYING AN AQUEOUS POLYMER GEL AND FOR COMMINUTING THE DRIED POLYMER GEL TO FORM DRIED POLYMER PARTICLES, AND METHOD FOR DRYING AN AQUEOUS POLYMER GEL AND FOR COMMINUTING THE DRIED POLYMER GEL TO FORM DRIED POLYMER PARTICLES | ||
Former [2019/21] | SYSTÈME DE SÉCHAGE À BANDE SERVANT AU SÉCHAGE D'UN GEL POLYMÈRE AQUEUX ET AU BROYAGE DU GEL POLYMÈRE SÉCHÉ POUR OBTENIR DES PARTICULES POLYMÈRES SÉCHÉES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉCHAGE D'UN GEL POLYMÈRE AQUEUX ET DE BROYAGE DU GEL POLYMÈRE SÉCHÉ POUR OBTENIR DES PARTICULES POLYMÈRES SÉCHÉES | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/21] | 15.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21202504.3 / EP4012309 | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.07.2017 | AL | 24.11.2021 | CY | 24.11.2021 | CZ | 24.11.2021 | DK | 24.11.2021 | EE | 24.11.2021 | ES | 24.11.2021 | FI | 24.11.2021 | HR | 24.11.2021 | IT | 24.11.2021 | LT | 24.11.2021 | LV | 24.11.2021 | MC | 24.11.2021 | MK | 24.11.2021 | NL | 24.11.2021 | PL | 24.11.2021 | RO | 24.11.2021 | RS | 24.11.2021 | SE | 24.11.2021 | SI | 24.11.2021 | SK | 24.11.2021 | SM | 24.11.2021 | TR | 24.11.2021 | BG | 24.02.2022 | NO | 24.02.2022 | GR | 25.02.2022 | IS | 24.03.2022 | PT | 24.03.2022 | AT | 04.07.2022 | GB | 04.07.2022 | IE | 04.07.2022 | LU | 04.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | FR | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 04.07.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
MK | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
AT | 04.07.2022 | ||
GB | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 04.07.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CY | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
AT | 04.07.2022 | ||
GB | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.07.2017 | |
AL | 24.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
AT | 04.07.2022 | ||
GB | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
AT | 04.07.2022 | ||
GB | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 04.07.2022 | ||
IE | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
IT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
GB | 04.07.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
FR | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
LU | 04.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
MC | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SI | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 24.11.2021 | |
CZ | 24.11.2021 | ||
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 24.11.2021 | |
DK | 24.11.2021 | ||
EE | 24.11.2021 | ||
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SK | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 24.11.2021 | |
ES | 24.11.2021 | ||
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RO | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | ES | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
SM | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | ES | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
NO | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | ES | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
NL | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
SE | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
GR | 25.02.2022 | ||
IS | 24.03.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | ES | 24.11.2021 | |
FI | 24.11.2021 | ||
HR | 24.11.2021 | ||
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
LV | 24.11.2021 | ||
PL | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
PT | 24.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 24.11.2021 | |
LT | 24.11.2021 | ||
RS | 24.11.2021 | ||
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 24.11.2021 | |
BG | 24.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 24.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US4138539 (LANDOLT PAUL H, et al) [X] 19,20 * the whole document * [A] 1-18; | [XI]US4417697 (SAIKI YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-11,16-18 * the whole document * [I] 5,12-15; | [X]US4559235 (MILLER JOHN T [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5668252 (YOKOI TOKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2014044780 (BASF SE [DE]) [AD] 1-20* the whole document *; | [AD]WO2015074966 (BASF SE [DE]) [AD] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0752892 | WO2006100300 | WO2011104152 | WO2013072419 | WO2014044780 | WO2015074966 | WO2015163512 | - ULLMANNS, Encyklopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 6. Auflage,, vol. 35, pages 73 - 103 | - VON F. L. BUCHHOLZ; A. T. GRAHAM, Modern Super Absorbent Polymer Technology, Wiley-VCH, (19980000), pages 87 - 93 |