EP3458904 - SPECTACLE GLASS AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/13] | SPECTACLE LENS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
[2019/19] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH Turnstrasse 27 73430 Aalen / DE | [2019/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAPPES, Timo Uhlandstr. 26 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
HORNAUER, Matthias Wiesenweg 7 73466 Lauchheim-Hülen / DE | 03 /
MICHELS, Georg Steinbeisstrasse 29 73430 Aalen / DE | 04 /
GLÖGE, Thomas Georg-von-der-Vring Strasse 11 73614 Schorndorf / DE | [2019/13] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/13] | Carl Zeiss AG - Patentabteilung Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 22 73447 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 17740757.4 | 19.07.2017 | [2019/13] | WO2017EP68241 | Priority number, date | EP20160180167 | 19.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16180167 | [2019/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018015442 | Date: | 25.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3458904 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3458904 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, G02C7/06, B29D11/00, B33Y10/00, G02B3/10 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
G02C7/022 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02C7/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29D11/00028 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29D11/00355 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B3/10 (CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRILLENGLAS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2019/13] | English: | SPECTACLE GLASS AND METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [2019/19] | French: | VERRE DE LUNETTE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2019/19] |
Former [2019/13] | SPECTACLE LENS AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | ||
Former [2019/13] | VERRE DE LUNETTES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2018 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/13] | 18.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18214846.0 / EP3492964 | EP18214855.1 / EP3499297 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.07.2020
13.07.2020
ADMISSIBLE Essilor International 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.07.2020
13.07.2020
ADMISSIBLE Essilor International 147 rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs-Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | 21.07.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.11.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.03.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/38] | 22.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.05.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2017 | AL | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | IE | 19.07.2020 | LU | 19.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IE | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IE | 19.07.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
LU | 19.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YDA]JPH05313107 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [YD] 4-6,8-11,13,17-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0009] * [A] 1-3,7,12,14-16; | [YDA]JP2003029216 (YOKOYAMA YOSHIO) [YD] 4-6,8-11,13,17-19 * paragraphs [0010] - [0013]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1-3,7,12,14-16; | [IDA]JP2004157487 (TERADA FUSAO) [ID] 4-6,8-11,13-15,17-19 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0003] - [0005] - [ 0007]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 1-3,7,12,16; | [A]WO2009100257 (LASER ENERGETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [ 0014] - [0018] - [ 0021]; figures 2A, 2B *; | [AD]EP2878989 (ZEISS CARL VISION INT GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-19 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0023] , [0057] , [0069] , [0085] , [0086] , [0105] , [0122]; figures 2b, 2c *; | [A]US2016161761 (QUERE LOÏC [FR], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0012] , [0022] , [0033] - [0036] - [0117] , [0118] , [0204] *; | [A] - H.-J Trost ET AL, "USING DROP-ON-DEMAND TECHNOLOGY FOR MANUFACTURING GRIN LENSES", (20011115), URL: http://www.microfab.com/archive/about/papers/ASPE_01.pdf, (20140611), XP055122645 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE3007572 | JPH05313107 | EP0955147 | US6103148 | WO0155752 | JP2003029216 | JP2004157487 | DE102005059485 | DE102005039113 | JP2008191186 | DE102008041869 | WO2010091888 | WO2010109154 | DE102009008997 | EP2385086 | EP2578649 | EP2692941 | WO2014108364 | WO2014179780 | WO2015014381 | EP2878989 | WO2015102938 | - H.-J. TROST et al., Proc. 2001 Ann. Mtg. ASPE, (20111110), pages 533 - 536 |