EP3407658 - COMMUNICATION BETWEEN GROUND STATION AND UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/48] | GROUND STATION, UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE, AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION BETWEEN GROUND STATION AND UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE | ||
[2023/28] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou Xaircraft Technology Co., Ltd. Room 3A01 No.1 Sicheng Road Gaotang Software Park Tianhe District Guangzhou, Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2018/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUYANG, Yuji Room 3A01 No.1 Sicheng Road Gaotang Software Park Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | 02 /
XIE, Anping Room 3A01 No.1 Sicheng Road Gaotang Software Park Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2018/48] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/48] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 17741019.8 | 16.01.2017 | [2018/48] | WO2017CN71290 | Priority number, date | CN20161044716 | 22.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610044716 | [2018/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017124988 | Date: | 27.07.2017 | Language: | ZH | [2017/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3407658 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.07.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L67/141, H04W4/44, G08G5/00, H04W72/04, H04W72/12, G05D1/00 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G08G5/0013 (EP,US);
H04W72/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/18506 (CN);
G05D1/0027 (EP,US);
G08G5/0026 (EP,US);
G08G5/0043 (EP,US);
G08G5/0069 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/141 (EP,US);
H04L67/60 (KR);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
H04W4/40 (US);
H04W4/44 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/0446 (CN);
H04W72/569 (US);
H04W76/10 (CN);
H04W76/14 (US);
|
Former IPC [2019/47] | H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04L29/06, G05D1/10, H04W12/06, G08G5/00, H04W4/40, G05D1/00, H04W4/44, H04W12/00 | ||
Former IPC [2019/32] | H04W72/12, H04W72/04, H04L29/06, G05D1/10, H04W12/06, G08G5/00, H04W4/40, G05D1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2018/48] | H04W72/12, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/48] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN BODENSTATION UND UNBEMANNTEM LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2023/28] | English: | COMMUNICATION BETWEEN GROUND STATION AND UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE | [2023/28] | French: | COMMUNICATION ENTRE UNE STATION AU SOL ET UN AÉRONEF TÉLÉGUIDÉ | [2023/28] |
Former [2018/48] | BODENSTATION, UNBEMANNTES LUFTFAHRZEUG SOWIE SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN BODENSTATION UND UNBEMANNTEM LUFTFAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2018/48] | GROUND STATION, UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE, AND SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATION BETWEEN GROUND STATION AND UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE | ||
Former [2018/48] | STATION AU SOL, AÉRONEF TÉLÉGUIDÉ, ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ENTRE UNE STATION AU SOL ET UN AÉRONEF TÉLÉGUIDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2017 | Translation filed | 24.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/48] | 07.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007291656 (KNAZIK ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0073] *; | [X]US2014297067 (MALAY BENJAMIN [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0041] * * page 46 * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0063] *; | [X]US2014316616 (KUGELMASS BRET [US]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] *; | [X]US2015316927 (KIM JIHWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0063] * | International search | [A]CN102768518 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [X]CN104615019 (WUHAN AIBIRD UAV CO LTD) [X] 1-30 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0016], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]CN104850132 (CETC SPECIAL MISSION AIRCRAFT SYSTEM ENGINEERING CO LTD) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [PX]CN105744636 (GUANGZHOU XAIRCRAFT CO LTD) [PX] 1-30 * claims 1-30 * |