EP3481942 - METHODS FOR CULTURING ORGANOIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellesce Limited Unit 18 Heath Park Cardiff Caerdydd CF14 4UJ / GB | [2019/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIS, Marianne J c/o Cellesce Limited 2 The Old Orchard Tetbury Hill Malmsbury Wiltshire SN16 9JW / GB | 02 /
CHAUDHURI, Julian c/o Cellesce Limited 2 The Old Orchard Tetbury Hill Malmsbury Wiltshire SN16 9JW / GB | 03 /
DALE, Trevor Clive c/o Cellesce Limited 2 The Old Orchard Tetbury Hill Malmsbury Wiltshire SN16 9JW / GB | [2019/20] | Representative(s) | Henderson, Helen Lee Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/07] |
Former [2019/20] | Henderson, Helen Lee Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 17742271.4 | 11.07.2017 | [2019/20] | WO2017GB52026 | Priority number, date | GB20160011982 | 11.07.2016 Original published format: GB 201611982 | [2019/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018011558 | Date: | 18.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3481942 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3481942 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/071 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
C12N5/0679 (EP,CN,US);
C12N5/0693 (CN);
C12N5/0081 (US);
C12N5/0062 (US);
C12N2509/00 (CN);
C12N2509/10 (US);
C12N2513/00 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2533/00 (EP,US);
C12N2533/50 (US);
C12N2533/90 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KULTIVIERUNG VON ORGANOIDEN | [2019/20] | English: | METHODS FOR CULTURING ORGANOIDS | [2019/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CULTURE D'ORGANOÏDES | [2019/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22156785.2 / EP4056679 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.08.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.07.2017 | AL | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | IS | 17.06.2022 | LU | 11.07.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.07.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.07.2017 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
LU | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | EE | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | EE | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
IS | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2012100084 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 16 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2013063588 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 16 * the whole document *; | [X] - HIROYUKI MIYOSHI ET AL, "In vitro expansion and genetic modification of gastrointestinal stem cells in spheroid culture", NATURE PROTOCOLS, GB, (20131114), vol. 8, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nprot.2013.153, ISSN 1754-2189, pages 2471 - 2482, XP055410398 [X] 1-10,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2013.153 | [X] - ENRICO DRIOLI ET AL, "Membrane Bioreactor for Cell Tissues and Organoids", ARTIFICIAL ORGANS, US, (20061001), vol. 30, no. 10, doi:10.1111/j.1525-1594.2006.00302.x, ISSN 0160-564X, pages 793 - 802, XP055404956 [X] 16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1525-1594.2006.00302.x |