EP3488029 - ALUMINIUM-COPPER CONNECTOR HAVING A HETEROSTRUCTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE HETEROSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Christian-Albrechts-Universität zu Kiel Christian-Albrechts-Platz 4 24118 Kiel / DE | [2019/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERNGROSS, Dr. Mark-Daniel Junkersstraße 18 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
BAYTEKIN-GERNGROSSE, Melike Junkersstraße 18 72770 Reutlingen / DE | 03 /
CARSTENSEN, Dr. Jürgen Karlsbader Str. 89 24146 Kiel / DE | 04 /
ADELUNG, Prof. Dr. Rainer Ellerbeker Weg 43c 24147 Kiel / DE | [2019/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2019/22] | Hansen, Jochen Hansen und Heeschen Patentanwälte Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 17742365.4 | 03.06.2017 | [2019/22] | WO2017DE100472 | Priority number, date | DE201610113641 | 25.07.2016 Original published format: DE102016113641 | [2019/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018019321 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3488029 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/38, C25D5/44, H01R13/03, C25F3/04, C25D7/06 | [2019/22] | CPC: |
C25D5/44 (EP,US);
C25D5/38 (EP,US);
C25D7/00 (EP,US);
C25D7/0607 (EP,US);
C25D7/0614 (US);
C25F3/04 (EP,US);
H01R13/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUM-KUPFER-KONNEKTOR AUFWEISEND EINE HETEROSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER HETEROSTRUKTUR | [2019/22] | English: | ALUMINIUM-COPPER CONNECTOR HAVING A HETEROSTRUCTURE, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE HETEROSTRUCTURE | [2019/22] | French: | CONNECTEUR EN ALUMINIUM-CUIVRE COMPRENANT UNE HÉTÉROSTRUCTURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LA HÉTÉROSTRUCTURE | [2019/22] | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/22] | 12.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |