EP3491111 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MICROCAPSULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firmenich SA 7, Rue de la Bergère 1242 Satigny / CH | [2020/40] |
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states Firmenich SA 1, route des Jeunes P.O. Box 239 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIGOUROUX ELIE, Florence Firmenich SA 1 route des Jeunes 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | 02 /
GODEFROY, Sonia Firmenich SA 1 route des Jeunes 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | 03 /
OSBORNE, Murray Firmenich SA 1 route des Jeunes 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | 04 /
STRUILLOU, Arnaud 1 route des Jeunes 1211 Geneva 8 / CH | [2019/23] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Dureisseix, Valérie Firmenich SA P.O. Box 239 Route des Jeunes 1 1211 Genève 8 / CH | Application number, filing date | 17743343.0 | 26.07.2017 | [2019/23] | WO2017EP68909 | Priority number, date | EP20160181501 | 27.07.2016 Original published format: EP 16181501 | [2019/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018019896 | Date: | 01.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3491111 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D3/50, C11D17/00, A61Q13/00, A61K8/84, A61K8/11, B01J13/16 | [2019/23] | CPC: |
C11D17/0039 (EP);
A61K8/14 (US);
A01N25/28 (EP);
A23L27/74 (EP);
A23P10/30 (EP);
A61K8/11 (EP);
A61K8/87 (EP);
A61K9/0014 (EP);
A61K9/5026 (EP);
A61K9/5031 (EP);
A61Q13/00 (EP);
B01J13/043 (EP);
B01J13/16 (EP);
B01J13/22 (EP);
B29B9/00 (US);
C11B9/00 (US);
C11D3/3703 (EP);
C11D3/3726 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIKROKAPSELN | [2019/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF MICROCAPSULES | [2019/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MICROCAPSULES | [2019/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2019 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/23] | 27.02.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2016177607 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [XP] 1-5,7-11 * page 4, lines 8-10 * * page 16, lines 16-24 * * page 16, line 26 - page 17, line 2 * * page 15, lines 15-16,21 - page 16, line 9 * * page 5, lines 26-30; claims 1-4 * * page 12, line 29 - page 13, line 7 * * page 14, lines 4-15 *; | [XAI]US3577515 (VANDEGAER JAN E) [X] 1-3,5,7-12 * column 10, lines 27-34; examples 17;12,21; claims 1,2,11 * * column 5, lines 31-35,44-57; example 10 * * column 6, lines 46-55 * * column 7, lines 24-26 * * column 3, lines 8-19,32-44 * [A] 4 [I] 6,13-15; | [A]WO2013068255 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]) [A] 1,3-5,7-15 * page 3, lines 4-11 *; | [A]US2011071064 (LEI YABIN [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0052] , [0031]; example 20; claims 1,2,8,9,20-24,29,34,35 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] - [0021] - [0032]; example 8 *; | [A]WO2013000587 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [A] 1,3-5,7-15 * page 3, lines 13-17; figure 1 * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 26 * * page 5, lines 4-11,29-33 * * page 6, lines 1-3,18-22 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 1 * * page 7, lines 13-29; claims 2-14,16 *; | [A]DE2342066 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1,3-6,8-11,13,14 * page 6, paragraphs 2-3; example 1 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 10, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 13, lines 1-6, paragraph 3 * * page 14, paragraphs 2-3; claims 1,2,7 *; | [A]EP0633059 (BOISE CASCADE CORP [US]) [A] 1-5,8-11,13-15 * page 5, lines 5-23,51-52; claims 1,5,6 * * page 4, lines 22-38 * * page 6, lines 11-41 * * page 7, lines 16-23,42-45; examples 1,2 * | by applicant | WO2011154893 |